Kalbaugh v. Martin
Respondent / Appellee: JIMMY MARTIN, Warden
Petitioner / Appellant: WAYNE DUKE KALBAUGH
Case Number: 19-6151
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 [10686832] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer B. Miller for Appellee Mr. Jimmy Martin for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/14/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6151] JBM [Entered: 10/14/2019 08:57 AM]
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order [10686134] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Phillips directing a limited remand to the district court. This appeal is abated pending the distirct court's decision on whether to issue a COA. Status report due 11/12/2019 by Wayne Duke Kalbaugh. Once the district court issues its decision, the clerk of the district court is directed to supplement the preliminary record. Served on 10/10/2019. [19-6151] [Entered: 10/10/2019 09:33 AM]
October 9, 2019 [10686050] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/09/2019. Fee or ifp forms due 11/08/2019 for Wayne Duke Kalbaugh. Notice of appearance due on 11/08/2019 for Wayne Duke Kalbaugh, and Notice of appearance due on 10/23/2019 for Jimmy Martin. [19-6151] [Entered: 10/09/2019 05:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalbaugh v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JIMMY MARTIN, Warden
Represented By: Diane L. Slayton
Represented By: Jay Schniederjan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WAYNE DUKE KALBAUGH
Represented By: Wayne Duke Kalbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?