Rhea, et al v. Apache Corporation

Defendant: APACHE CORPORATION
Petitioner / Appellant: ENABLE MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, LP, ENABLE GAS GATHERING & PROCESSING, LLC and ENABLE GAS GATHERING, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: BIGIE LEE RHEA
Case Number: 19-7000
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 [10628600] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants brief and appendix until 03/27/2019 for Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC, and Enable Midstream Partners, LP. [19-7000] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:35 AM]
January 17, 2019 [10619663] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/28/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-7000] [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:27 AM]
January 16, 2019 [10619420] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stratton Taylor for Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:06 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619412] Entry of appearance submitted by Stratton Taylor for Appellants Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Midstream Partners, LP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000]--[Edited 01/16/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] RT [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:51 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619393] Docketing statement filed by Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Midstream Partners, LP. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] BJW [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:27 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619358] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/16/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 02/25/2019 for Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Midstream Partners, LP. (Text-only event; no attachment.) [19-7000] [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:37 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619333] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Midstream Partners, LP. Served on: 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] BJW [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:01 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619323] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Robin F. Fields, Mrs. Heidi M. Nichols and Mr. Bryan J. Wells for Enable Midstream Partners, LP, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. All parties listed are counsel in this appeal. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:47 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619313] Entry of appearance submitted by Robin F. Fields, Bryan J. Wells, Heidi M. Nichols for Appellants Enable Gas Gathering, LLC, Enable Midstream Partners, LP and Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000]--[Edited 01/16/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 1/16/19. ] BJW [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:27 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619188] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Mark Banner for Apache Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:44 AM]
January 16, 2019 [10619180] Notice of non-participation filed by Mark Banner for Apache Corporation. Date of Service: 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] MB [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:21 AM]
January 16, 2019 [10619178] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark Banner for Not Party Apache Corporation for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] --[Edited 01/16/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MB [Entered: 01/16/2019 09:19 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10618404] Attorney Mr. Andrew G. Pate for Bigie Lee Rhea admitted to the bar of this court. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:34 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10618403] Attorney Lloyd Nolan Duck, III for Bigie Lee Rhea admitted to the bar of this court. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:33 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10618129] Entry of appearance filed by James Edward Warner, III for Bigie Lee Rhea. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7000] [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:26 PM]
January 11, 2019 [10618081] Entry of appearance submitted by James E. Warner, III for Appellee Bigie Lee Rhea for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] --[Edited 01/11/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/11/19] JEW [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:03 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10618059] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/11/2019 for Andrew G. Pate. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:19 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10618048] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 02/11/2019 for Trey N. Duck. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:11 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10617987] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Burrage for Bigie Lee Rhea. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000] [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:13 AM]
January 11, 2019 [10617979] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael Burrage for Appellee Bigie Lee Rhea for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7000]--[Edited 01/11/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] MB [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:08 AM]
January 10, 2019 [10617897] Entry of appearance filed by Trey N. Duck and Mr. Andrew G. Pate for Bigie Lee Rhea. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/10/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7000] [Entered: 01/10/2019 03:03 PM]
January 10, 2019 [10617885] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew Gordon Pate ; Lloyd Nolan Duck, III for Appellee Bigie Lee Rhea for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/10/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/10/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed 01/10/19][19-7000] AGP [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:48 PM]
January 2, 2019 [10615500] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/02/2019 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 01/16/2019 for Enable Gas Gathering & Processing, LLC, Enable Gas Gathering, LLC and Enable Midstream Partners, LP. Notice of appearance also due on 01/16/2019 for Bigie Lee Rhea [19-7000] [Entered: 01/02/2019 12:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhea, et al v. Apache Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ENABLE MIDSTREAM PARTNERS, LP
Represented By: Valerie V. Hatami
Represented By: Kassie N. McCoy
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Represented By: Bryan J. Wells
Represented By: Heidi M. Nichols
Represented By: Robin F. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ENABLE GAS GATHERING & PROCESSING, LLC
Represented By: Valerie V. Hatami
Represented By: Kassie N. McCoy
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Represented By: Bryan J. Wells
Represented By: Heidi M. Nichols
Represented By: Robin F. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ENABLE GAS GATHERING, LLC
Represented By: Valerie V. Hatami
Represented By: Kassie N. McCoy
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Represented By: Bryan J. Wells
Represented By: Heidi M. Nichols
Represented By: Robin F. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APACHE CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark Banner
Represented By: Michael L. Beatty
Represented By: Rebecca Hitchcock Noecker Esq.
Represented By: James C. T. Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BIGIE LEE RHEA
Represented By: James Edward Warner Esq. III
Represented By: Reggie N. Whitten
Represented By: Lawrence R. Murphy Jr.
Represented By: Andrew G. Pate
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Angelovich
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Bradley E. Beckworth
Represented By: Lloyd Nolan Duck III
Represented By: Cody L. Hill
Represented By: Brooke A. Churchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?