In re: Barrett
Petitioner: KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-7028
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order [10655071-1] Denied; Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, unsigned, unpublished; Final order filed denying successive 2255 by Judges Briscoe, Kelly and Eid. [19-7028] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:51 PM]
June 3, 2019 [10652996] Response filed by United States of America to Application for Authority to File a Successive 28 U.S.C. sec. 2255 Motion to Vacate under McCoy v. Louisiana. Served on 06/03/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-7028] JBK [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:26 PM]
May 22, 2019 [10650717] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey Bradford Kahan for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/22/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-7028] [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:22 PM]
May 22, 2019 [10650689] --[Edited 05/22/2019 by PJ to remove PDF - This document has been filed in a subsequent entry.] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey B. Kahan for Respondent United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7028] JBK [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:51 PM]
May 22, 2019 [10650686] Minute order filed - Respondent's Unopposed Motion for 14 Day Extension to Respond to the Movant's Petition for Permission to File Successive 2255 is granted. The response shall be filed on or before June 12, 2019. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7028] [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:46 PM]
May 22, 2019 [10650630] Motion filed by Respondent United States of America to extend time to file a response until 06/12/2019. Served on: 05/22/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-7028] JBK [Entered: 05/22/2019 12:52 PM]
May 20, 2019 [10650003] Errata sheet filed by Kenneth Eugene Barrett. Served on 05/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-7028] [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:46 PM]
May 15, 2019 [10648950] CORRECTED Minute order filed -Response due to petition for permission to file successive 2255 on 05/29/2019 for United States of America. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7028] [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:21 PM]
May 15, 2019 [10648925] Minute order filed - Response due to petition for permission to file successive 2255 on 05/28/2019 for United States of America. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-7028] [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:45 PM]
May 15, 2019 [10648915] Case docketed. Petition for permission to file successive 2255 motion in district court. DATE RECEIVED: 05/15/2019 [19-7028] [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeffrey Bradford Kahan
Represented By: Christopher Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENNETH EUGENE BARRETT
Represented By: David B. Autry
Represented By: Heather E. Williams
Represented By: Joan M. Fisher
Represented By: Carrie Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?