Martinez-Mendoza v. Barr
Petitioner: DORIS ABIGAIL MARTINEZ-MENDOZA
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting United States Attorney General and WILLIAM P. BARR, Acting United States Attorney General
Case Number: 19-9506
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 28, 2020 Martinez-Mendoza v. Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 [10628982] Minute order filed - Petitioner's brief due on 04/08/2019 for Doris Abigail Martinez-Mendoza. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-9506] [Entered: 02/25/2019 12:22 PM]
February 25, 2019 [10628979] Agency record filed. Number of volumes filed: 1. [19-9506] TS [Entered: 02/25/2019 12:18 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628794] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting respondent's motion to extend time to file agency ROA. Agency record due 03/11/2019 for William P. Barr. Counsel is cautioned that future motions not in compliance with 10th Cir. R. 27.1 may be denied. Served on 02/22/2019. [19-9506] [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:47 PM]
February 22, 2019 [10628774] Motion filed by Respondent Mr. William P. Barr to extend time to file agency record on appeal until 03/11/2019. Served on: 02/22/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-9506] JAS [Entered: 02/22/2019 03:52 PM]
January 30, 2019 [10623000] Docketing statement filed by Doris Abigail Martinez-Mendoza. Served on 01/30/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-9506] KGR [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:42 PM]
January 28, 2019 [10621898] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Jennifer A. Singer for Matthew G. Whitaker. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-9506] [Entered: 01/28/2019 08:55 AM]
January 28, 2019 [10621892] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer A. Singer for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-9506]--[Edited 01/28/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 1/28/2019] JAS [Entered: 01/28/2019 08:48 AM]
January 23, 2019 [10621057] Entry of appearance filed by Kevin G Richards for Doris Abigail Martinez-Mendoza. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-9506] [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:50 PM]
January 23, 2019 [10621049] Entry of appearance submitted by Kevin G. Richards for for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/23/2019. Manner of Service: US mail.--[Edited 01/23/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 1/23/19.] [19-9506] KGR [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:34 PM]
January 16, 2019 [10619277] Petition for review filed. Original and Served on 01/16/2019. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Lynch, Oil. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 01/16/2019 letter. Fee pd:, Receipt #: 1045638712, Amount: $ 500.00. Docketing statement and entry of appearance due 01/30/2019 for Doris Abigail Martinez-Mendoza. Agency record due 02/25/2019 for Matthew G. Whitaker.. Notice of appearance due on 01/30/2019 for Matthew G. Whitaker [19-9506] [Entered: 01/16/2019 12:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Mendoza v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Acting United States Attorney General
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Lynch
Represented By: Oil Oil
Represented By: Jennifer A. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DORIS ABIGAIL MARTINEZ-MENDOZA
Represented By: Kevin G. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?