State of Colorado v. United States Dept. of Justice, et al
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Plaintiff / Appellee: THE STATE OF COLORADO
Case Number: 20-1256
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 [10764797] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court granting motion to extend time to file apet brief. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/08/2020 for William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice. No further extensions may be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 08/21/2020. Text only entry - no attachment. [20-1256] [Entered: 08/21/2020 03:41 PM]
August 21, 2020 [10764774] Motion filed by Appellants William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 10/08/2020. Served on: 08/21/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1256] BH [Entered: 08/21/2020 02:59 PM]
July 29, 2020 [10758945] Filed notice record is complete. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Served on 07/29/2020. Appellants brief and appendix due on 09/08/2020 for William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice. [20-1256] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:56 PM]
July 28, 2020 [10758566] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel Tenny for United States Department of Justice and William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1256] [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:38 PM]
July 28, 2020 [10758544] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel Tenny for Appellants William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/28/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/28/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/28/20.] [20-1256] DT [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:47 AM]
July 27, 2020 [10758237] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/03/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1256] [Entered: 07/27/2020 03:03 PM]
July 27, 2020 [10758200] Entry of appearance filed by Eric Olson for The State of Colorado. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1256] [Entered: 07/27/2020 02:16 PM]
July 27, 2020 [10758190] Docketing statement filed by William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice. Served on 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1256] BH [Entered: 07/27/2020 02:03 PM]
July 27, 2020 [10758189] Notice received from William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1256] BH [Entered: 07/27/2020 01:59 PM]
July 27, 2020 [10758185] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric R. Olson for Appellee The State of Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/27/2020 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed on 07/27/2020] [20-1256] EO [Entered: 07/27/2020 01:57 PM]
July 27, 2020 [10758151] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bradley Hinshelwood for United States Department of Justice and William Pelham Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1256] [Entered: 07/27/2020 11:56 AM]
July 27, 2020 [10758145] Entry of appearance submitted by Brad Hinshelwood for Appellants William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1256]--[Edited 07/27/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 7/27/2020] BH [Entered: 07/27/2020 11:45 AM]
July 24, 2020 [10757860] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kathleen Spalding for The State of Colorado. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1256] [Entered: 07/24/2020 01:08 PM]
July 24, 2020 [10757855] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Patrick Louis Sayas for The State of Colorado. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1256] [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:56 PM]
July 24, 2020 [10757845] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick L. Sayas for Appellee The State of Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/24/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1256] KS [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:32 PM]
July 24, 2020 [10757833] Entry of appearance submitted by Kathleen L. Spalding for Appellee The State of Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/24/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/24/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/24/20.] [20-1256] KS [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:08 PM]
July 13, 2020 [10754286] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/13/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 07/27/2020 for William Pelham Barr and United States Department of Justice. Notice of appearance due on 07/27/2020 for the State of Colorado. [20-1256] [Entered: 07/13/2020 08:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Colorado v. United States Dept. of Justice, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Joseph J. DeMott
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Joseph J. DeMott
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: William Allen
Represented By: Eric Olson
Represented By: Kathleen Spalding
Represented By: Patrick Louis Sayas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?