Brooks v. Archuleta, et al
Respondent / Appellee: LOU ARCHULETA, Warden and PHILIP J. WEISER, Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Petitioner / Appellant: JASON BROOKS
Case Number: 20-1326
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 9, 2021 Brooks v. Archuleta

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 [10784448] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [20-1326] [Entered: 11/09/2020 08:19 AM]
October 29, 2020 [10782176] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Vols 1-2 - pleadings. Vol 3 - state court record (1 CD (received on 10/30/20)). Record on appeal filed 10/29/2020. [20-1326]--[Edited 11/06/2020 by KLP to add the state court record to this entry] [Entered: 10/29/2020 07:37 AM]
October 28, 2020 [10782048] Order filed by Clerk of the Court lifting the abatement of this appeal. See order for details. Served on 10/28/2020. [20-1326] [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:10 PM]
October 28, 2020 [10782051] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief/certificate of appealability, and fee or ifp forms due by 12/07/2020 for Jason Brooks. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/18/2020. [20-1326] [Entered: 10/28/2020 02:14 PM]
October 28, 2020 [10782014] Status report filed by Jason Brooks. Served on. Manner of Service: (no certficate of service). [20-1326] [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:13 PM]
October 28, 2020 [10781773] District Court order filed denying COA. [20-1326] [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:22 AM]
October 5, 2020 [10776058] Entry of appearance filed by Jason Brooks. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 10/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1326] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:57 PM]
September 29, 2020 [10774488] Entry of appearance submitted by Ryan A. Crane for Appellees Philip J. Weiser and Mr. Lou Archuleta for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/29/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1326]--[Edited 09/29/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 9/29/2020] RC [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:22 AM]
September 29, 2020 [10774512] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ryan Crane for Philip J. Weiser and Mr. Lou Archuleta. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party already listed in the case. Served on 09/29/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1326] [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:41 AM]
September 23, 2020 [10773023] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - In light of this court's decision in United States v. Higley, No. 17-1111, we direct a limited remand to the district court to consider whether to issue a COA for this appeal. Pending a decision by the district court this appeal is abated. Status report due 10/23/2020 by Jason Brooks. Served on 09/23/2020. [20-1326] [Entered: 09/23/2020 04:10 PM]
September 22, 2020 [10772220] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/22/2020. Notice of appearance due on 10/06/2020 for Lou Archuleta and Philip J. Weiser. Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due 10/22/2020 for Jason Brooks. [20-1326] [Entered: 09/22/2020 08:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brooks v. Archuleta, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LOU ARCHULETA, Warden
Represented By: John J. Fuerst III
Represented By: Ryan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: PHILIP J. WEISER, Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Represented By: John J. Fuerst III
Represented By: Ryan Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JASON BROOKS
Represented By: Jason Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?