Borden v. County of Costilla, Colorado, et al
Defendant / Appellee: STATE OF COLORADO, Governor: Jared Polis, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CEO: Richard D. Fairbank, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CEO: Carol Tome and COUNTY OF COSTILLA, COLORADO, CEO: Stephen Romero
Plaintiff / Appellant: RONALD L. BORDEN
Case Number: 20-1445
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 [10802750] Dismissed; Lack of Jurisdiction; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Holmes, Phillips and Carson. [20-1445] [Entered: 01/26/2021 08:54 AM]
January 13, 2021 [10799618] Response to order of 12/22/2020 filed by Ronald L. Borden. Served on 01/12/2021. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [20-1445] [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:56 AM]
January 5, 2021 [10797695] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. LeeAnn Morrill for State of Colorado. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/05/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1445] [Entered: 01/05/2021 05:24 PM]
January 5, 2021 [10797648] Entry of appearance submitted by LeeAnn Morrill for Appellee State of ColoradoGovernor Jared Polis for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/05/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 01/05/2021 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 01/05/2021][20-1445] LM [Entered: 01/05/2021 03:42 PM]
January 4, 2021 [10797216] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Betsy L. Stewart for County of Costilla, Colorado. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/04/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-1445] [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:53 PM]
January 4, 2021 [10797208] Entry of appearance submitted by Betsy L. Stewart for Appellee County of Costilla, Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/04/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/04/2021 by SDS to remove pdfs from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1445] BLS [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:43 PM]
January 4, 2021 [10797094] Entry of appearance filed by James Sigel for United Parcel Service. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 01/04/2021. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [20-1445] [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:15 PM]
January 4, 2021 [10797087] Entry of appearance submitted by James R. Sigel for Appellee United Parcel Service for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/04/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 01/04/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1445] JS [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:04 PM]
December 30, 2020 [10796400] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edward P. Timmins, Sr., Esq. for Capital One Financial Corporation. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/30/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1445] [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:34 AM]
December 30, 2020 [10796396] Entry of appearance submitted by Edward P. Timmins for Appellee Capital One Financial Corporation for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/30/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-1445] --[Edited 12/30/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/30/2020.] EPT [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:23 AM]
December 28, 2020 [10795611] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Sullivan Rice, Esq. for County of Costilla, Colorado. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/28/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1445] [Entered: 12/28/2020 08:31 AM]
December 24, 2020 [10795549] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas Sullivan Rice for Appellee County of Costilla, Colorado for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1445]--[Edited 12/28/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 12/28/2020] TSR [Entered: 12/24/2020 11:54 AM]
December 22, 2020 [10795140] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. On or before 01/12/2021, Mr. Ronald L. Borden shall file a written response that sets forth any basis for this court's exercise of jurisdiction over his appeal. See attached order. Served on 12/22/2020. [20-1445] --[Edited 12/28/2020 by AT to add correct due date of response.] [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:01 PM]
December 22, 2020 [10794954] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/22/2020 Fee or ifp forms due 01/21/2021 for Ronald L. Borden. Notice of appearance due on 01/21/2021 for Ronald L. Borden, and Notice of appearance due on 01/05/2021 for Capital One Financial Corporation, County of Costilla, Colorado, State of Colorado, and United Parcel Service. [20-1445] [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Borden v. County of Costilla, Colorado, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF COLORADO, Governor: Jared Polis
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CEO: Richard D. Fairbank
Represented By: Edward P. Timmins Esq.
Represented By: Edward P. Timmins Esq. Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CEO: Carol Tome
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Represented By: James Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF COSTILLA, COLORADO, CEO: Stephen Romero
Represented By: Betsy L. Stewart
Represented By: Thomas Sullivan Rice Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD L. BORDEN
Represented By: Ronald L. Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?