Santa Fe Alliance, et al v. City of Santa Fe, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MONIKA STEINHOFF, ARTHUR FIRSTENBERG and SANTA FE ALLIANCE FOR PUBLIC HEALTH AND SAFETY
Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF SANTA FE, NEW MEXICO, HECTOR H. BALDERAS, Attorney General of New Mexico and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 20-2066
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 [10755843] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant are accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices). Appellees' brief now due 08/17/2020 for Hector H. Balderas, City of Santa Fe, New Mexico and United States of America. Paper copies of appellants' brief and appendix due 07/23/2020 by Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, and Monika Steinhoff. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-2066] [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:56 PM]
July 16, 2020 [10755826] Appellant's appendix filed by Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. Total number of volumes filed: 3. Served on 07/16/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-2066] EEA [Entered: 07/16/2020 01:51 PM]
July 13, 2020 [10754616] Notice of deficient appendix received from Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. Type of deficiency: documents in appendix are scanned (brief is ok). See attached letter for specifics. Appendix due on 07/16/2020 for Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff [20-2066] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:45 PM]
July 13, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket - see corrected appendix filed 7/16/2020. [LAB] [10754582] Appellant's appendix filed by Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. Total number of volumes filed: 3. Served on 07/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 07/13/2020 by LAB - appendix cited as deficient 7/13/2020 (brief is ok).] [20-2066] EEA [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:12 PM]
July 13, 2020 [10754570] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. Served on 07/13/2020 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-2066] EEA [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:01 PM]
June 19, 2020 [10749717] Attorney Gregory Ara Chakalian for Hector H. Balderas admitted to the bar of this court. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/24/2020 02:11 PM]
June 12, 2020 [10747021] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 07/13/2020 for Gregory Ara Chakalian. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/12/2020 08:32 AM]
June 11, 2020 [10746927] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney motion to withdraw as attorney. Mr Nichola Sydow is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Hector Balderas. Served on 06/11/2020. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/11/2020 02:29 PM]
June 11, 2020 [10746880] Motion filed by Appellee Hector H. Balderas for attorney Nicholas M. Sydow to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 06/11/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-2066] NMS [Entered: 06/11/2020 01:23 PM]
June 11, 2020 This duplicate entry of appearance has been removed from the docket. [AT] [10746797] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory Ara Chakalian for Appellee Hector H. Balderas for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] GAC [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:00 AM]
June 11, 2020 [10746715] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nicholas Mark Sydow and Gregory Ara Chakalian for Hector H. Balderas. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/11/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2066] [Entered: 06/11/2020 09:01 AM]
June 11, 2020 [10746712] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory Ara Chakalian and Nicholas Sydow for Appellee Hector H. Balderas for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/11/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 06/11/2020 by NA] GAC [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:52 AM]
June 10, 2020 [10746548] Entry of appearance filed by Jack Starcher for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:42 PM]
June 10, 2020 [10746544] Entry of appearance submitted by Jack Starcher for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/10/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-2066] JS [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:34 PM]
June 3, 2020 [10744715] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Entry of appearance due and not filed with the court. Notice of appearance due on 06/08/2020 for Hector H. Balderas. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/03/2020 09:05 AM]
June 2, 2020 [10744635] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Cassandra Casaus Currie for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/03/2020 07:13 AM]
June 2, 2020 [10744630] Entry of appearance submitted by Cassandra Casaus Currie for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/03/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-2066] CCC [Entered: 06/02/2020 06:39 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744552] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/02/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 07/13/2020 for Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, and Monika Steinhoff. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/02/2020 03:10 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744517] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/09/2020 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-2066] [Entered: 06/02/2020 02:09 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744511] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erika E. Anderson for Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:39 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744508] Notice received from Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2066] EEA [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:36 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744506] Entry of appearance submitted by Erika E. Anderson for Appellants Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety, Arthur Firstenberg and Monika Steinhoff for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/02/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-2066] EEA [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:34 PM]
June 2, 2020 [10744505] Docketing statement filed by Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. Served on 06/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] EEA [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:31 PM]
May 26, 2020 [10742614] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Marcos D. Martinez for City of Santa Fe, New Mexico. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2066] [Entered: 05/26/2020 01:40 PM]
May 26, 2020 [10742605] Entry of appearance submitted by Marcos D. Martinez for Appellee City of Santa Fe, New Mexico for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/26/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-2066] MDM [Entered: 05/26/2020 01:34 PM]
May 19, 2020 [10741200] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/19/2020. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/02/2020 for Arthur Firstenberg, Santa Fe Alliance for Public Health and Safety and Monika Steinhoff. Notice of appearance due on 06/02/2020 for Hector H. Balderas, City of Santa Fe, New Mexico and United States of America. [20-2066] [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Santa Fe Alliance, et al v. City of Santa Fe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MONIKA STEINHOFF
Represented By: Erika E. Anderson
Represented By: Adam Cherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARTHUR FIRSTENBERG
Represented By: Arthur Firstenberg
Represented By: Erika E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANTA FE ALLIANCE FOR PUBLIC HEALTH AND SAFETY
Represented By: Erika E. Anderson
Represented By: Adam Cherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF SANTA FE, NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Marcos D. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HECTOR H. BALDERAS, Attorney General of New Mexico
Represented By: Gregory Ara Chakalian
Represented By: Joshua R. Granata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen Ehrlich
Represented By: Cassandra Casaus Currie
Represented By: Jack Starcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?