Young v. Balderas
Defendant / Appellee: HECTOR H. BALDERAS
Plaintiff / Appellant: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG
Case Number: 20-2141
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 [10788699] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I- Pleadings. Record on appeal due 11/24/2020. [20-2141] [Entered: 11/24/2020 03:54 PM]
November 20, 2020 [10787845] Attorney Erin Elizabeth Lecocq for Hector H. Balderas admitted to the bar of this court. [20-2141] [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:36 PM]
November 17, 2020 [10786510] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 12/28/2020 for Huguette Nicole Young. Fee or ifp forms due by 12/28/2020 for Huguette Nicole Young. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/08/2020 [20-2141] [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:32 AM]
November 16, 2020 [10786266] Entry of appearance filed by Huguette Nicole Young. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on (no certificate of service). [20-2141] [Entered: 11/16/2020 01:22 PM]
October 30, 2020 [10782621] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 11/30/2020 for Erin Elizabeth Lecocq. [20-2141] [Entered: 10/30/2020 08:44 AM]
October 29, 2020 [10782493] Entry of appearance filed by Erin Elizabeth Lecocq for Hector H. Balderas. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/29/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2141] [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:03 PM]
October 29, 2020 [10782412] Entry of appearance submitted by Erin E. Lecocq for Appellee Hector H. Balderas for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/29/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2141] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 10/29/2020 by NA] EEL [Entered: 10/29/2020 01:32 PM]
October 16, 2020 [10778955] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/16/2020. Fee is due and notice of appearance by 11/16/2020 for Huguette Nicole Young. Notice of appearance due on 10/30/2020 for Hector H. Balderas. [20-2141] [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Young v. Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HECTOR H. BALDERAS
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Lecocq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG
Represented By: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?