Counce v. Wolting, et al
Defendant: COUNTY OF ELLSWORTH, KANSAS and JOE SHEPACK
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN DOE, bearded civilian's friend, ERIC D. SAUER, Captain, N & T Commander, Kansas Highway Patrol, KIRK E. SIMONE, Asset Forfeiture Coordinator, Kansas Highway Patrol, THERESA L. STAUDINGER, Attorney, JOHN DOE, Deputy Sheriff for Ellsworth County, MARK A. BRUCE, Major, Interim Superintendent, Kansas Highway Patrol, KANSAS STATE HIGHWAY PATROL, GREG ARNOLD, Trooper, Kansas Highway Patrol, TRACY PLOUTZ, Ellsworth County Sheriff, RYAN WOLTING, Technical Kansas State Trooper, Kansas Highway Patrol, DARIAN P. DERNOVISH, Legal Counsel & Records Custodian, Kansas Highway Patrol, JOHN DOE, civilian with beard, JOHN/JANE DOES, Kansas State HIghway Patrol Supervisors and Watch Commander(s), DAVID CHAMBERLIN, Ellsworth County Deputy Sheriff and CRISTINA D. TROIANI, Attorney for Sean O'Neil, Chief of Administrative Appeals
Plaintiff / Appellant: KENNETH COUNCE
Case Number: 20-3027
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 [10727073] Miscellaneous correspondence received from Kenneth Counce but not filed. Original only. Served on 03/13/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3027]--[Edited 03/23/2020 by JM to edit docket text.] [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:48 PM]
March 12, 2020 [10725173] Appellant memorandum brief filed by Kenneth Counce. Served on 03/05/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3027] [Entered: 03/12/2020 03:27 PM]
March 10, 2020 [10724036] Entry of appearance filed by Kenneth Counce. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3027] [Entered: 03/10/2020 09:17 AM]
March 6, 2020 [10723433] Entry of appearance filed by Carrie Barney for Kirk E. Simone, Eric D. Sauer, Darian P. Dernovish, Mark A. Bruce, Ryan Wolting and Greg Arnold. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/06/2020. Manner of Service: US mail, email [20-3027] [Entered: 03/06/2020 01:55 PM]
March 6, 2020 [10723421] Notice of non-participation filed by Brian G. Boos for Theresa Staudinger. Date of Service: 03/06/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3027] BGB [Entered: 03/06/2020 01:48 PM]
March 6, 2020 [10723395] Entry of appearance submitted by Carry A. Barney for Appellees Greg Arnold, Mark A. Bruce, Darian P. Dernovish, Ryan Wolting, Eric D. Sauer and Kirk E. Simone for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/06/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3027] --[Edited 03/06/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 3/6/20] CB [Entered: 03/06/2020 12:57 PM]
March 6, 2020 [10723164] Notice of non-participation filed by David E. Rogers and Kelsey N. Frobisher for Joe Shepack and Board of County Commissioners of Ellsworth County, Kansas. Date of Service: 03/06/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-3027] KF [Entered: 03/06/2020 07:55 AM]
March 3, 2020 [10722235] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: appellees have not filed an entry of appearance. Notice of appearance due on 03/06/2020 for Greg Arnold, Mark A. Bruce, County of Ellsworth, Kansas, Darian P. Dernovish, Eric D. Sauer, Joe Shepack, Kirk E. Simone, Theresa L. Staudinger and Ryan Wolting. [20-3027] [Entered: 03/03/2020 02:28 PM]
February 28, 2020 [10721198] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kelsey Frobisher and Mr. David E. Rogers for Tracy Ploutz and David Chamberlin. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/28/2020. Manner of Service: Clerk via email. [20-3027] [Entered: 02/28/2020 07:38 AM]
February 27, 2020 [10721111] Entry of appearance submitted by Kelsey N. Frobisher for Appellees Tracy Ploutz and David Chamberlin for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/27/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3027]--[Edited 02/28/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] KF [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:36 PM]
February 18, 2020 [10718292] Order filed by Clerk of the Court considering this case for summary disposition under 10 Cir. R. 27. Appellant's memorandum brief due 03/10/2020 for Kenneth Counce. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of the court. Served on 02/18/2020. [20-3027] [Entered: 02/18/2020 08:54 AM]
February 14, 2020 [10718206] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/14/2020. Fee or 1915 forms due 03/16/2020 for Kenneth Counce. Notice of appearance due on 02/28/2020 for Greg Arnold, Mark A. Bruce, David Chamberlin, County of Ellsworth, Kansas, Darian P. Dernovish, Tracy Ploutz, Eric D. Sauer, Joe Shepack, Kirk E. Simone, Theresa L. Staudinger and Ryan Wolting, and Notice of appearance due on 03/16/2020 for Kenneth Counce. [20-3027] [Entered: 02/14/2020 04:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Counce v. Wolting, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, bearded civilian's friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC D. SAUER, Captain, N & T Commander, Kansas Highway Patrol
Represented By: Rachael D. Longhofer
Represented By: Carrie Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIRK E. SIMONE, Asset Forfeiture Coordinator, Kansas Highway Patrol
Represented By: Rachael D. Longhofer
Represented By: Carrie Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THERESA L. STAUDINGER, Attorney
Represented By: Brian Gerard Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Deputy Sheriff for Ellsworth County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK A. BRUCE, Major, Interim Superintendent, Kansas Highway Patrol
Represented By: Rachael D. Longhofer
Represented By: Carrie Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KANSAS STATE HIGHWAY PATROL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG ARNOLD, Trooper, Kansas Highway Patrol
Represented By: Carrie Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY PLOUTZ, Ellsworth County Sheriff
Represented By: Kelsey Frobisher
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN WOLTING, Technical Kansas State Trooper, Kansas Highway Patrol
Represented By: Carrie Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DARIAN P. DERNOVISH, Legal Counsel & Records Custodian, Kansas Highway Patrol
Represented By: Rachael D. Longhofer
Represented By: Carrie Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, civilian with beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN/JANE DOES, Kansas State HIghway Patrol Supervisors and Watch Commander(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID CHAMBERLIN, Ellsworth County Deputy Sheriff
Represented By: Kelsey Frobisher
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRISTINA D. TROIANI, Attorney for Sean O'Neil, Chief of Administrative Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF ELLSWORTH, KANSAS
Represented By: Kelsey Frobisher
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE SHEPACK
Represented By: Kelsey Frobisher
Represented By: David E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH COUNCE
Represented By: Kenneth Counce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?