McGee v. Corizon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: D. LUNDRY, Medical Administrator, KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORIZON and (FNU) (LNU), Corizon Unknown Doctor
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTONIO ALEXANDER MCGEE
Case Number: 20-3111
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 14, 2020 McGee v. Corizon

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 [10760646] Notice of deficient motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis received from Appellant Antonio Alexander McGee. Type of deficiency: missing pages. Fee or 1915 forms remain due on 08/25/2020. Served on 08/05/2020. --[Edited 08/05/2020 by MLB to include deadline date] [20-3111] [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:29 PM]
August 5, 2020 [10760643] Appellant brief filed by Antonio Alexander McGee. Original and 4 copies made by clerk. Served on 07/27/2020 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [20-3111] [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:27 PM]
August 5, 2020 [10760642] Entry of appearance filed by Antonio Alexander McGee. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/27/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-3111] [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:25 PM]
July 20, 2020 [10756335] District Court order filed. Plaintiffs appeal from the judgment in this case is not taken in good faith for the purposes of 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). [20-3111] [Entered: 07/20/2020 10:45 AM]
July 16, 2020 [10755607] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1 - pleadings. [20-3111] [Entered: 07/16/2020 08:25 AM]
July 16, 2020 [10755598] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or 1915 forms and appellant's brief due on 08/25/2020 for Antonio Alexander McGee. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 08/06/2020. [20-3111] [Entered: 07/16/2020 08:12 AM]
June 22, 2020 [10749167] Miscellaneous pleading regarding jury demand and ifp received from Antonio Alexander McGee but not filed. No action taken. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3111] [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:54 PM]
June 16, 2020 [10747873] Amended notice of appeal filed. [20-3111] [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:52 PM]
June 15, 2020 [10747399] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/15/2020. Notice of appearance due on 07/15/2020 for Antonio Alexander McGee. Fee or 1915 forms due 07/15/2020 for Antonio Alexander McGee. [20-3111] [Entered: 06/15/2020 10:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: McGee v. Corizon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. LUNDRY, Medical Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: (FNU) (LNU), Corizon Unknown Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO ALEXANDER MCGEE
Represented By: Antonio Alexander McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?