Butler v. State of Kansas, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SHERRI L. BECKER and STATE OF KANSAS
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD C. BUTLER
Case Number: 20-3139
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 [10767023] Docketing Statement for supreme court of kansas received from Richard C. Butler but not filed. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3139] [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:01 PM]
August 18, 2020 [10763563] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: appellant has not filed his jurisdictional memo brief. Jurisdictional memo brief now due on 08/25/2020 for Richard C. Butler. [20-3139] [Entered: 08/18/2020 08:49 AM]
August 10, 2020 [10761884] Motion regarding trial files received from Richard C. Butler but not filed. (No relief requested.) Original. [20-3139] [Entered: 08/11/2020 07:34 AM]
August 3, 2020 [10760113] Miscellaneous pleading received from Richard C. Butler but not filed. Served on 07/29/2020 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3139] [Entered: 08/04/2020 08:24 AM]
July 24, 2020 [10757906] Correspondence received from Richard C. Butler but not filed. Served on 07/21/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-3139] [Entered: 07/24/2020 03:06 PM]
July 24, 2020 [10757889] Entry of appearance filed by Richard C. Butler. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/21/2020 (court only). Manner of Service: US mail [20-3139] [Entered: 07/24/2020 02:33 PM]
July 13, 2020 [10754350] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellant to file a memorandum brief addressing whether he can establish timely filing of the notice of appeal with respect to the district court's judgment. Briefing on the merits is suspended however preliminary documents remain due by 8/10/20. Response due on 08/06/2020 for Richard C. Butler. See order for additional information. Served on 07/13/2020. [20-3139] [Entered: 07/13/2020 09:51 AM]
July 10, 2020 [10754144] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/10/2020. Fee or 1915 forms and notice of appearance due 08/10/2020 for Richard C. Butler. [20-3139] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Butler v. State of Kansas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHERRI L. BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF KANSAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD C. BUTLER
Represented By: Richard C. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?