Roberts v. Winder, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JAMES M. WINDER, individually, ROSIE RIVERA, in her official capacities as the Salt Lake County Sheriff and CEO of the Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and THE UNIFIED POLICE DEPARTMENT OF GREATER SALT LAKE
Plaintiff / Appellant: NICHOLAS J. ROBERTS
Case Number: 20-4082
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 [10773690] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/25/2020. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 11/04/2020 for Nicholas J. Roberts. [20-4082] [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:12 PM]
September 25, 2020 [10773635] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/02/2020 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4082] [Entered: 09/25/2020 10:34 AM]
September 18, 2020 [10771672] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-4082] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:23 PM]
September 3, 2020 [10767868] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Becky Janke. Transcript of 07/02/2020 motion hearing due 09/21/2020 for Becky Janke. [20-4082] [Entered: 09/03/2020 01:33 PM]
August 25, 2020 [10765281] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 09/08/2020 for Becky Janke (7/2/20 motion for summary judgment). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-4082] [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:39 AM]
August 25, 2020 [10765270] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Nicholas J. Roberts. Transcript ordered: Served on: 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082] RWH [Entered: 08/25/2020 11:31 AM]
August 25, 2020 [10765253] Deficiency notice issued. Transcript order form now due 08/28/2020 for Nicholas J. Roberts. [20-4082] [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:30 AM]
August 25, 2020 [10765234] Docketing statement filed by Nicholas J. Roberts. Served on 08/25/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082] RWH [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:35 AM]
August 24, 2020 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] This had a docketing statement as the attachment. Attorney told to submit the entry or separately file the docketing statment. [10765168] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert W. Hughes for Appellant Nicholas J. Roberts for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/24/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082] MWH [Entered: 08/24/2020 06:27 PM]
August 18, 2020 [10763622] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Camille N. Johnson for James M. Winder, The Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and Rosie Rivera. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/18/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-4082] [Entered: 08/18/2020 10:11 AM]
August 18, 2020 [10763611] Entry of appearance submitted by Camille N. Johnson for Appellees Rosie Rivera, The Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and James M. Winder for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/18/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082]--[Edited 08/18/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CNJ [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:57 AM]
August 13, 2020 [10762701] Entry of appearance filed by Robert W. Hughes and Jesse Carl Trentadue for Nicholas J. Roberts. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082] --[Edited 08/13/2020 by SLS to replace PDF to correct typo.] [Entered: 08/13/2020 12:10 PM]
August 13, 2020 [10762675] Entry of appearance submitted by Jesse C. Trentadue and Robert J. Hughes for Appellant Nicholas J. Roberts for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082] --[Edited 08/13/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JCT [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:28 AM]
August 13, 2020 [10762663] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Andrew M. Morse and R. Scott Young for James M. Winder, The Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and Rosie Rivera. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082] [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:48 AM]
August 13, 2020 [10762661] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew M. Morse; Scott Young, at Snow, Christensen & Martineau for Appellees Rosie Rivera, The Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake, James M. Winder and Appellant Nicholas J. Roberts for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/13/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-4082]--[Edited 08/13/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SY [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:35 AM]
August 10, 2020 [10761831] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/10/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 08/24/2020 for Nicholas J. Roberts. Notice of appearance also due on 08/24/2020 for Rosie Rivera, The Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake and James M. Winder [20-4082]--[Edited 08/11/2020 by DJD to replace prelim record] [Entered: 08/10/2020 04:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roberts v. Winder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES M. WINDER, individually
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Represented By: Camille N. Johnson
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Represented By: Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSIE RIVERA, in her official capacities as the Salt Lake County Sheriff and CEO of the Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Represented By: Camille N. Johnson
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Represented By: Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE UNIFIED POLICE DEPARTMENT OF GREATER SALT LAKE
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Represented By: Camille N. Johnson
Represented By: Andrew M. Morse
Represented By: Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICHOLAS J. ROBERTS
Represented By: Jesse Carl Trentadue
Represented By: Robert W. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?