Phillips v. Austin Police Department, et al
Defendant: AUSTIN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Defendant / Appellee: TRAVIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE, AUSTIN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, JOHN DOE, sued as Male Paramedic, Male US Marshal 1, Male US Marshal 2, Male US Marshal 3, SETON FAMILY OF HOSPITALS, CHRISTOPHER BORN, CEO Dell Childrens, DAVID MOSS CORRECTIONAL - TULSA COUNTY JAIL, BRITTANY GARRETT, Dell Childrens RN recruiter, CARMEN NICKEL, MS, RN, President of Oklahoma Board of Nursing, DEB BROWN, former Chief Nurse Officer at Dell Children's, OKLAHOMA BOARD OF NURSING, ASCENSION, KATHERINE THOMAS, President of Texas Board of Nursing, JANE DOE, Sued as Female Paramedic, TEXAS STATE BAR, TRAVIS COUNTY TEXAS, CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS, C. PIERCE, Austin Police Officer, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, TEXAS BOARD OF NURSING, GUSTAVO GARCIA, JR., TRAVIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and TULSA EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES AUTHORITY
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMANDA KAYE PHILLIPS
Case Number: 20-5025
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 [10729847] Addendum to opening brief filed by Amanda Kaye Phillips. Original and 4 copies (made by clerk). Served on 03/24/2020 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [20-5025] [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:19 PM]
March 25, 2020 [10728089] Entry of appearance filed by Amanda Kaye Phillips. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-5025] [Entered: 03/25/2020 09:35 AM]
March 25, 2020 [10728088] Application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit on district court form received from Amanda Kaye Phillips but not filed (unnecessary and not on proper form). Dated 03/16/2020. [20-5025] [Entered: 03/25/2020 09:33 AM]
March 25, 2020 [10728081] Appellant's brief filed by Amanda Kaye Phillips. Original and 4 copies. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. [20-5025] [Entered: 03/25/2020 09:24 AM]
March 18, 2020 [10726358] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. [20-5025] [Entered: 03/18/2020 07:21 AM]
March 17, 2020 [10725991] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due by 04/27/2020 for Amanda Kaye Phillips. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 04/07/2020 [20-5025] [Entered: 03/17/2020 06:54 AM]
March 12, 2020 [10724932] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/12/2020 Notice of appearance due on 04/13/2020 for Amanda Kaye Phillips [20-5025] [Entered: 03/12/2020 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Phillips v. Austin Police Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUSTIN COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, sued as Male Paramedic, Male US Marshal 1, Male US Marshal 2, Male US Marshal 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SETON FAMILY OF HOSPITALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER BORN, CEO Dell Childrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID MOSS CORRECTIONAL - TULSA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITTANY GARRETT, Dell Childrens RN recruiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARMEN NICKEL, MS, RN, President of Oklahoma Board of Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEB BROWN, former Chief Nurse Officer at Dell Children's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OKLAHOMA BOARD OF NURSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASCENSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE THOMAS, President of Texas Board of Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, Sued as Female Paramedic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS STATE BAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS COUNTY TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF AUSTIN, TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. PIERCE, Austin Police Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS BOARD OF NURSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUSTAVO GARCIA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TULSA EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMANDA KAYE PHILLIPS
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?