Hernandez-Garcia v. Barr
Petitioner: JAVIER EVELIO HERNANDEZ-GARCIA
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 20-9546
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 2, 2021 Hernandez-Garcia v. Garland

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 [10738277] Docketing statement filed by Javier Evelio Hernandez-Garcia. Served on 05/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9546] RM [Entered: 05/06/2020 11:37 AM]
May 6, 2020 [10738295] Entry of appearance filed by Ross Militello for Javier Evelio Hernandez-Garcia. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9546] [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:07 PM]
May 6, 2020 [10738275] Entry of appearance submitted by Ross A. Militello for Petitioner Javier Evelio Hernandez-Garcia for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/06/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 05/06/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 5/6/20.] [20-9546] RM [Entered: 05/06/2020 11:34 AM]
May 6, 2020 [10738189] Certificate of interested parties filed by Mr. William P. Barr to Notice of Appearance for Edward C. Durant. Served on 05/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-9546] [Edited to reflect proper relief-- Edited 05/06/2020 by NA] ECD [Entered: 05/06/2020 08:57 AM]
May 5, 2020 [10737979] Entry of appearance submitted by Edward C. Durant for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/05/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9546] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 05/05/2020 by NA] ECD [Entered: 05/05/2020 12:08 PM]
May 5, 2020 [10737983] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edward C. Durant for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/05/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-9546] [Entered: 05/05/2020 12:16 PM]
May 1, 2020 [10737488] Petition for review filed. Served on 05/01/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, General Counsel, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 05/04/2020 letter. Fee pd:Check #: credit card, Receipt #: A10-47223-325, Amount: $ $500. Docketing statement due 05/18/2020 for Javier Evelio Hernandez-Garcia. Agency record due 06/15/2020 for William P. Barr.. Notice of appearance due on 05/18/2020 for William P. Barr and Javier Evelio Hernandez-Garcia [20-9546] [Entered: 05/04/2020 08:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hernandez-Garcia v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAVIER EVELIO HERNANDEZ-GARCIA
Represented By: Ross Militello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Represented By: Oil Oil
Represented By: Edward C. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?