Mirbekov v. Barr
Petitioner: ERKINBEK MIRBEKOV
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 20-9570
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 [10751258] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Henry Douglast Hollithron for Erkinbek Mirbekov. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/30/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9570] [Entered: 06/30/2020 02:55 PM]
June 30, 2020 [10751249] Entry of appearance submitted by Henry D. Hollithron for Petitioner Erkinbek Mirbekov for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/30/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9570] --[Edited 06/30/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/30/2020.] HDH [Entered: 06/30/2020 02:46 PM]
June 29, 2020 [10750671] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Rosanne Perry for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/29/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9570] [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:55 AM]
June 29, 2020 [10750667] Entry of appearance submitted by Rosanne M. Perry for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/29/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9570] --[Edited 06/29/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/29/2020.] RP [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:50 AM]
June 26, 2020 [10750449] Petition for review filed. Served on 06/26/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondent: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, and Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 06/26/2020 letter. Fee pd. Receipt #: A10-47420-621, Amount: $ 500.00. Docketing statement due 07/10/2020 for Erkinbek Mirbekov. Agency record due 08/05/2020 for William P. Barr.. Notice of appearance due on 07/10/2020 for William P. Barr and Erkinbek Mirbekov. [20-9570] [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mirbekov v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Rosanne Perry
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Represented By: Oil Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERKINBEK MIRBEKOV
Represented By: Henry Douglast Hollithron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?