Casco Ayala, et al v. Barr
Petitioner: NELSON A. CASCO AYALA and FERNANDO J. CASCO AYALA
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 20-9579
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 3, 2021 Casco Ayala v. Garland

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 [10755360] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Buchanan for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9579] [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:55 AM]
July 15, 2020 [10755337] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher B. Buchanan for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/15/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/15/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-9579] CB [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:23 AM]
July 13, 2020 [10754805] Petition for review filed. Original filed. Served on 07/13/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: Buchanan, DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 07/14/2020 letter. Fee pd:, Receipt #: A10-47477-932, Amount: $ 500.00. Docketing statement due 07/28/2020 for Fernando J. Casco Ayala and Nelson A. Casco Ayala. Agency record due 08/24/2020 for William P. Barr. Notice of appearance due on 07/28/2020 for William P. Barr, Fernando J. Casco Ayala and Nelson A. Casco Ayala. --[Edited 07/14/2020 by SDS to correct filed date. The petition was received by the court on 07/13/2020] [20-9579] [Entered: 07/14/2020 08:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Casco Ayala, et al v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Oil Oil
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: Christopher Buchanan
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NELSON A. CASCO AYALA
Represented By: Margaret Wilson Pascual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FERNANDO J. CASCO AYALA
Represented By: Margaret Wilson Pascual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?