Valerio-Lopez v. Barr
Petitioner: JOSE ALEJANDRO VALERIO-LOPEZ, AKA Pedro Torres-Gamez
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 20-9588
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 16, 2021 Valerio-Lopez v. Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 [10760979] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Joseph Anthony O'Connell for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9588] [Entered: 08/06/2020 01:03 PM]
August 6, 2020 [10760919] Entry of appearance submitted by Joseph A. O'Connell for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/06/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-9588] JAO [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:15 AM]
August 5, 2020 [10760837] Petition for review filed. Original and 1 copies. Served on 08/06/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 08/06/2020 letter. Fee pd:, Receipt #: A10-47564-925, Amount: $500.00. Docketing statement and notice of appearance due 08/20/2020 for Jose Alejandro Valerio-Lopez. Agency record due 09/15/2020 for William P. Barr. Notice of appearance due on 08/20/2020 for William P. Barr. [20-9588] [Entered: 08/06/2020 08:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Valerio-Lopez v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Joseph Anthony O'Connell
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Represented By: Oil Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE ALEJANDRO VALERIO-LOPEZ, AKA Pedro Torres-Gamez
Represented By: Christian M. Frank Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?