Dominguez-Gutierrez v. Barr
Petitioner: ENRIQUE DOMINGUEZ-GUTIERREZ
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 20-9592
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 19, 2021 Dominguez-Gutierrez v. Garland

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 [10762379] Entry of appearance filed by Judith Roberta O'Sullivan, Esq. for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-9592] [Entered: 08/12/2020 12:26 PM]
August 12, 2020 [10762377] Entry of appearance submitted by Judith O'Sullivan for for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-9592]--[Edited 08/12/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 8/12/2020] ACP [Entered: 08/12/2020 12:22 PM]
August 12, 2020 [10762291] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Anthony Cardozo Payne for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9592] [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:33 AM]
August 12, 2020 [10762275] Entry of appearance filed by Doctor Judith Roberta O'Sullivan, Esq. for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail [20-9592] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:59 AM]
August 12, 2020 [10762269] Entry of appearance submitted by Anthony C. Payne for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-9592] --[Edited 08/12/2020 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 08/12/2020]. ACP [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:49 AM]
August 12, 2020 [10762267] Entry of appearance submitted by Judith O'Sullivan for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-9592] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 08/12/2020 by NA] JRO [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:46 AM]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order [10762109] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying motion to appoint attorney filed by Petitioner Enrique Dominguez-Gutierrez. Served on 08/11/2020. [20-9592] [Entered: 08/11/2020 01:57 PM]
August 11, 2020 [10762069] Appellant's motion filed by Enrique Dominguez-Gutierrez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 08/07/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-9592] [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:24 PM]
August 11, 2020 [10762067] Appellant's motion filed by Enrique Dominguez-Gutierrez to appoint attorney. Served on 08/07/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-9592] [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:22 PM]
August 11, 2020 [10762066] Entry of appearance filed by Enrique Dominguez-Gutierrez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/07/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-9592] [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:21 PM]
August 11, 2020 [10762056] Petition for review filed. Served on 08/07/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 08/11/2020 letter. Notice of appearance due on 08/25/2020 for William P. Barr, and Notice of appearance due on 09/10/2020 for Enrique Dominguez-Gutierrez. [20-9592] [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dominguez-Gutierrez v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Represented By: Judith Roberta O'Sullivan Esq.
Represented By: Anthony Cardozo Payne
Represented By: Oil Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ENRIQUE DOMINGUEZ-GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Enrique Dominguez-Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?