Matrix Trust Company v. Midlands Management Corp., et al
Counter Claimant: DENNIS J. OTTIS, RICHARD BIRD, SHERYL CASE, COLIN CALDWELL, CALDWELL AND PARTNERS, INC. and MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Appellant: MATRIX TRUST COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 21-1034
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 [10817771] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/14/2021 for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:02 AM]
March 5, 2021 [10812805] Attorney Mr. Justin Neal Bryan for Midlands Management Corporation, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Dennis J. Ottis, Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Sheryl Case admitted to the bar of this court. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:56 AM]
February 24, 2021 [10811262] Attorney Hossain Arnold Shokouhi for Midlands Management Corporation, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Dennis J. Ottis, Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Sheryl Case admitted to the bar of this court. [21-1034] [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:31 PM]
February 18, 2021 [10808641] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Arnold Shokouhi. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:11 AM]
February 18, 2021 [10808632] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/22/2021 for Justin Bryan. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:54 AM]
February 17, 2021 [10808430] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin Bryan for Appellees Richard Bird, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. OttisCharlie Caldwell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034]--[Edited 02/17/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/17/2021] CJK [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:38 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808428] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton J. Kaiser for Appellees Richard Bird, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. OttisCharlie Caldwell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/17/2021 by NA] CJK [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:36 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808431] Entry of appearance submitted by Arnold Shokouhi for Appellees Richard Bird, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. OttisCharlie Caldwell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/17/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1034] CJK [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:39 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808433] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Clayton J. Kaiser for Dennis J. Ottis, Midlands Management Corporation, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell and Richard Bird. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:41 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808446] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Bryan for Dennis J. Ottis, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell, Richard Bird and Midlands Management Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:13 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808440] Entry of appearance filed by Arnold Shokouhi for Dennis J. Ottis, Midlands Management Corporation, Sheryl Case, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Colin Caldwell and Richard Bird. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (party listed previously disclosed). Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:00 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808418] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/17/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/29/2021 for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. [text only entry] [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:16 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808411] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert A. Lewis for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:10 PM]
February 17, 2021 [10808308] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 10:09 AM]
February 17, 2021 [10808227] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justin Roel Chapa and Mr. Danny Scot Ashby for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/17/2021 08:57 AM]
February 17, 2021 [10808400] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert A. Lewis for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/17/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1034] RAL [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:54 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808059] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/23/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:41 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808052] Transcript is not necessary form filed by Matrix Trust Company, LLC. Transcript ordered: none. Served on: 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] --[Edited 02/16/2021 by AT to use correct event code.] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:37 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808048] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah L. Hartley for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034]--[Edited 02/16/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/16/2021] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:33 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808075] Entry of appearance submitted by Michael Peter Carey for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/16/2021 by NA] MPC [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:49 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808098] Entry of appearance filed by Sarah L. Hartley for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party is already in the appeal. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:24 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808125] Docketing statement filed by Matrix Trust Company, LLC. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034] SLH [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:26 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808093] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Michael Peter Carey for Matrix Trust Company, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1034] [Entered: 02/16/2021 04:11 PM]
February 16, 2021 [10808081] Entry of appearance submitted by Justin R. Chapa, Danny S. Ashby for Appellant Matrix Trust Company, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1034]--[Edited 02/17/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/17/2021] JRC [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:58 PM]
February 3, 2021 [10805075] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/03/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 02/17/2021 for Matrix Trust Company. Notice of appearance due on 02/17/2021 for Richard Bird, Colin Caldwell, Caldwell and Partners, Inc., Sheryl Case, Midlands Management Corporation and Dennis J. Ottis. [21-1034] [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Matrix Trust Company v. Midlands Management Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DENNIS J. OTTIS
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: RICHARD BIRD
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SHERYL CASE
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: COLIN CALDWELL
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CALDWELL AND PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Hossain Arnold Shokouhi
Represented By: Justin Neal Bryan
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MATRIX TRUST COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Sarah L. Hartley
Represented By: Robert A. Lewis
Represented By: Danny Scot Ashby
Represented By: Michael Peter Carey
Represented By: Justin Roel Chapa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?