Boles v. Long, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: RUSSELL MARSHALL BOLES
Respondent / Appellee: PHILLIP WEISER, Attorney General of the State of Colorado and JEFF LONG, S.C.F.
Case Number: 21-1238
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 [10849704] Appellant brief and application for certificate of appealability filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. Original and 4 copies. Served on 08/08/2021 by US mail. [21-1238] [Entered: 08/11/2021 11:41 AM]
August 11, 2021 [10849705] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles to appoint attorney. Served on 08/08/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1238] [Entered: 08/11/2021 11:43 AM]
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order [10849713] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by Appellant Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. Served on 08/11/2021. [21-1238] [Entered: 08/11/2021 12:14 PM]
July 23, 2021 [10845533] Entry of appearance filed by Lisa Michaels for Mr. Jeff Long and Phillip Weiser. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1238] [Entered: 07/23/2021 07:07 AM]
July 22, 2021 [10845524] Entry of appearance submitted by Lisa Michaels for Appellees Mr. Jeff Long and Phillip Weiser for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1238] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 07/23/2021 by NA] LM [Entered: 07/22/2021 05:11 PM]
July 19, 2021 [10844386] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Notice of appearance due on 07/22/2021 for Jeff Long and Phillip Weiser. [21-1238] [Entered: 07/19/2021 07:52 AM]
July 8, 2021 [10842289] Courtesy copy of Prisoner's motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 which was filed in district court by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. [21-1238] [Entered: 07/08/2021 12:00 PM]
July 8, 2021 [10842287] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Russell Marshall Boles. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/29/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1238] [Entered: 07/08/2021 11:56 AM]
June 28, 2021 [10839716] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and Certificate of Appealability due 08/09/2021 for Russell Marshall Boles [21-1238] [Entered: 06/28/2021 10:47 AM]
June 28, 2021 [10839782] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Comments: One volume containing pleadings. [21-1238] [Entered: 06/28/2021 11:56 AM]
June 28, 2021 [10839995] District court order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [21-1238] [Entered: 06/29/2021 07:45 AM]
June 25, 2021 [10839378] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/24/2021. Notice of appearance due on 07/26/2021 for Russell Marshall Boles, and Notice of appearance due on 07/09/2021 for Jeff Long and Phillip Weiser. [21-1238] [Entered: 06/25/2021 07:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Boles v. Long, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RUSSELL MARSHALL BOLES
Represented By: Russell Marshall Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: PHILLIP WEISER, Attorney General of the State of Colorado
Represented By: Lisa Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JEFF LONG, S.C.F.
Represented By: Lisa Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?