Rocky Mountain Wild, et al v. Haaland, et al
Defendant: DEBRA HAALAND, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Interior and BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Plaintiff / Appellee: ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD, NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE and INDEPENDENT PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Case Number: 21-1426
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 [10884592] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Steven J. Rosenbaum for IPAA and API. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/10/2022. Manner of Service: email. [21-1426] [Entered: 01/10/2022 09:50 AM]
January 10, 2022 [10884584] Entry of appearance submitted by Steven J. Rosenbaum for Appellants API and IPAA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/10/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/10/2022 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1426] SJR [Entered: 01/10/2022 09:34 AM]
January 5, 2022 [10883715] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Notice of appearance due on 01/10/2022 for American Petroleum Institute and Independent Petroleum Association of America [21-1426] [Entered: 01/05/2022 09:06 AM]
December 29, 2021 [10882654] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - This matter is before the court on the proposed briefing schedule submitted by all parties to these modified cross-appeals. The following briefing schedule shall apply to these modified cross-appeals. Appellant Cross-Appellee's appendix due on 03/07/2022 for Bureau of Land Management and Debra Haaland, and Intervenor Defendants- Cross/Appellant's appendix due on 03/18/2022 for American Petroleum Institute and Independent Petroleum Association of America, First brief on cross-appeal due 03/07/2022 for Federal Defendants Bureau of Land Management and Debra Haaland; First brief on cross-appeal due 03/18/2022 for Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute and Independent Petroleum Association of America. Second cross-appeal brief due 04/22/2022 for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild and WildEarth Guardians. Third brief on cross-appeal due 06/03/2022 Intervenor Defendants American Petroleum Institute, Independent Petroleum Association of America. Third brief on cross-appeal due 05/20/2022 for Federal Defendants Bureau of Land Management and Debra Haaland. Fourth brief on cross-appeal due 06/24/2022 for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild, and WildEarth Guardians. See attached order. Served on 12/29/2021. [21-1412, 21-1425, 21-1426] [Entered: 12/29/2021 03:11 PM]
December 28, 2021 [10882465] Response filed by API and IPAA in 21-1426, Rocky Mountain Wild, National Parks Conservation Association, Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Debra Haaland, and Bureau of Land Management to December 15, 2021 Order. Served on 12/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-1412, 21-1425, 21-1426] SJR [Entered: 12/28/2021 04:12 PM]
December 20, 2021 [10880575] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/20/2021. [text only entry] [21-1426] [Entered: 12/20/2021 09:32 AM]
December 20, 2021 [10880486] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/27/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-1426] [Entered: 12/20/2021 06:48 AM]
December 17, 2021 [10880465] Notice received from API and IPAA that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/17/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1426] SJR [Entered: 12/17/2021 06:59 PM]
December 17, 2021 [10880464] Docketing statement filed by API and IPAA. Served on 12/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1426] SJR [Entered: 12/17/2021 06:57 PM]
December 15, 2021 [10879615] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - These appeals are procedurally consolidated for preparation of a joint appendix, cross-appeal briefing, oral argument (if granted), and submission to a panel of judges. The parties are directed to submit to the court a proposed cross-appeal briefing schedule, and indicate whether the parties intend to submit a joint appendix for the consolidated cross-appeals. Response due on 12/29/2021. Served on 12/15/2021. [21-1412, 21-1425, 21-1426] [Entered: 12/15/2021 09:46 AM]
December 13, 2021 [10879104] Entry of appearance submitted by Stuart Gillespie & Caitlin Miller for Appellees Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild and WildEarth Guardians for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 12/13/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1426] SCG [Entered: 12/13/2021 03:42 PM]
December 13, 2021 [10879115] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stuart C. Gillespie and Caitlin Alexandra Miller for National Parks Conservation Association, Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians and Rocky Mountain Wild. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/13/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1426] [Entered: 12/13/2021 03:53 PM]
December 10, 2021 [10878422] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/09/2021 Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 12/27/2021 for American Petroleum Institute and Independent Petroleum Association of America. Notice of appearance due on 12/27/2021 for Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Rocky Mountain Wild and WildEarth Guardians [21-1426] [Entered: 12/10/2021 07:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Wild, et al v. Haaland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROCKY MOUNTAIN WILD
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Stuart C. Gillespie
Represented By: Caitlin Alexandra Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA HAALAND, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Interior
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Joseph H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Represented By: Bradley Ervin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: INDEPENDENT PETROLEUM ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley Ervin
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?