Vianez v. Denver Courts, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JUAN VIANEZ
Defendant / Appellee: DENVER COURTS, MAYOR, GOV. OF COLORADO and WARDEN
Case Number: 21-1435
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 [10893281] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: not filed. Fee or 1915 forms due 02/23/2022 for Juan Vianez [21-1435] [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:38 AM]
January 18, 2022 [10886459] Appellant brief filed by Juan Vianez. Original and 4 copies. Served on by N/A. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [21-1435] [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:11 PM]
January 6, 2022 [10884205] Miscellaneous correspondence received from Juan Vianez but not filed. Letter in response sent. Served on 12/30/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-1435] [Entered: 01/06/2022 03:32 PM]
January 6, 2022 [10884073] Entry of appearance filed by Juan Vianez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/30/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-1435] [Entered: 01/06/2022 11:33 AM]
December 28, 2021 [10882209] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings.. [21-1435] [Entered: 12/28/2021 07:32 AM]
December 27, 2021 [10881955] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or 1915 forms due 02/07/2022 for Juan Vianez. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 01/18/2022. [21-1435] [Entered: 12/27/2021 10:54 AM]
December 20, 2021 [10880601] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/20/2021. Notice of appearance due on 01/20/2022 for Juan Vianez. [21-1435] [Entered: 12/20/2021 10:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vianez v. Denver Courts, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN VIANEZ
Represented By: Juan Vianez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAYOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOV. OF COLORADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?