Mina v. Red Robin International, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK MINA, as an individual and on behalf of all other similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC. and RED ROBIN GOURMET BURGERS, INC.
Case Number: 22-1286
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2022 [10953586] Motion filed by Appellees Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc. to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 12/13/2022. Served on: 11/08/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-1286] LAM [Entered: 11/08/2022 09:59 AM]
November 8, 2022 [10953603] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - granting first joint motion to extend time to file apet brief (15 days) Appellant's brief and appendix due on 12/13/2022 for Mark Mina. Served on 11/08/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. [22-1286] [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:25 AM]
October 31, 2022 [10951924] Attorney Mr. Thomas Edward Wheeler for Mark Mina admitted to the bar of this court. [22-1286] [Entered: 11/01/2022 04:36 PM]
October 13, 2022 [10947456] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 11/21/2022 for Mark Mina. [22-1286] [Entered: 10/13/2022 10:03 AM]
October 12, 2022 [10947309] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Richard Maxton Murray for Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested parties are already in the appeal. Served on 10/12/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1286] [Entered: 10/12/2022 03:44 PM]
October 12, 2022 [10947292] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard M Murray for Appellees Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1286]--[Edited 10/12/2022 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 10/12/2022] RMM [Entered: 10/12/2022 03:20 PM]
September 29, 2022 [10944417] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 10/31/2022 for Thomas Edward Wheeler. [22-1286] [Entered: 09/29/2022 04:52 PM]
September 28, 2022 [10944010] Filed notice record is complete. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Served on 09/28/2022. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 11/07/2022 for Mark Mina. [22-1286] [Entered: 09/28/2022 03:04 PM]
September 28, 2022 [10943870] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/19/2022 at 10:30 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [22-1286] [Entered: 09/28/2022 11:16 AM]
September 27, 2022 [10943740] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Lauri A. Mazzuchetti for Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/28/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1286] [Entered: 09/28/2022 06:01 AM]
September 27, 2022 [10943707] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas E. Wheeler for Appellant Mark Mina for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1286] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 09/27/2022 by NA] TEW [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:15 PM]
September 27, 2022 [10943695] Entry of appearance submitted by Lauri A. Mazzuchetti for Appellees Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 09/28/2022 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 09/27/2022] [22-1286] LAM [Entered: 09/27/2022 03:57 PM]
September 27, 2022 [10943708] Notice received from Mark Mina that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1286] TEW [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:16 PM]
September 27, 2022 [10943710] Docketing statement filed by Mark Mina. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-1286] TEW [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:18 PM]
September 27, 2022 [10943723] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/04/2022 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-1286] [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:29 PM]
September 27, 2022 [10943719] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Edward Wheeler for Mark Mina. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/27/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-1286] [Entered: 09/27/2022 04:26 PM]
September 22, 2022 [10942688] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 09/22/2022. [22-1286] [Entered: 09/22/2022 04:32 PM]
September 13, 2022 [10940264] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/13/2022. Fee is due by 09/27/2022 for Mark Mina. Docketing statement due 09/27/2022 for Mark Mina. Transcript order form due 09/27/2022 for Mark Mina. Notice of appearance due on 09/27/2022 for Mark Mina, Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc. [22-1286] [Entered: 09/13/2022 01:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mina v. Red Robin International, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK MINA, as an individual and on behalf of all other similarly situated
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Mark S. Greenstone
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Stacy A. Carpenter
Represented By: Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Represented By: Whitney M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RED ROBIN GOURMET BURGERS, INC.
Represented By: Stacy A. Carpenter
Represented By: Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Represented By: Richard Maxton Murray
Represented By: Whitney M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?