United States v. Orduno-Ramirez
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: OMAR FRANCISCO ORDUNO-RAMIREZ
Case Number: 22-3019
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions -Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 [10898452] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 3. Volumes 1&2 - pleadings; Volume 3 - SEALED pleadings. Appellant's brief due on 04/20/2022 for Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. [22-3019] [Entered: 03/11/2022 02:34 PM]
March 10, 2022 [10898193] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing the district court clerk to prepare and transmit a record on appeal containing the items designated by Mr. Orduno-Ramirez on 2/25/22; abating Appeal Nos. 22-3018, 22-3020, 22-3021, 22-3022, 22-3023, 22-3024, 22-3025, 22-3026 and 22-3027. (Record on appeal due district court 03/31/2022.) Served on 03/10/2022. (See the attachment for the order.) [22-3018, 22-3019, 22-3020, 22-3021, 22-3022, 22-3023, 22-3024, 22-3025, 22-3026, 22-3027] [Entered: 03/10/2022 01:48 PM]
March 9, 2022 [10897821] Response filed by Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez in 22-3019, Mr. Scott L. Meinert in 22-3018, Mr. David J. Lougee in 22-3020, Tyrssverd Raven Harssfell in 22-3021, Jerome Richard Birdsong, II in 22-3022, Jesus Galvan-Campos in 22-3023, Mr. Charles Leonhardt Haupt in 22-3024, Hector Javier Valdez in 22-3025, Michael C. Redifer in 22-3026, Joshua L. McDaniel in 22-3027 to Case Management Order filed 2/29/22. Served on 03/09/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-3019, 22-3018, 22-3020, 22-3021, 22-3022, 22-3023, 22-3024, 22-3025, 22-3026, 22-3027] PN [Entered: 03/09/2022 11:36 AM]
February 28, 2022 [10895670] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Within 10 days from the date of this order, parties are directed to file responses setting forth a plan for coordianted case management of these appeals. Such a plan may include, but is not limited to, procedurally consolidating these appeals (as well as future appeals by similarly-situated defendants) for briefing (Appellants opening brief and application for a certificate of appealability now; and the governments response brief if one is ordered later), preparation of the record from the master civil docket. See order for additional information. Response due on 03/10/2022 for Scott L. Meinert, United States of America, Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez, David J. Lougee, Tyrssverd Raven Harssfell, Jerome Richard Birdsong II, Jesus Galvan-Campos, Charles Leonhardt Haupt, United States of America, Hector Javier Valdez, Michael C. Redifer, Joshua L. McDaniel and United States of America. The deadline for the district court records is vacated pending further order of the court. Served on 02/28/2022. [22-3018, 22-3019, 22-3020, 22-3021, 22-3022, 22-3023, 22-3024, 22-3025, 22-3026, 22-3027] [Entered: 02/28/2022 12:38 PM]
February 25, 2022 [10895249] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. Served on: 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3019] PN [Entered: 02/25/2022 10:01 AM]
February 25, 2022 [10895288] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due from district court 03/18/2022. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-3019] [Entered: 02/25/2022 11:03 AM]
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order [10895425] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich granting appellant's motion to continue appointment. Served on 02/25/2022. [22-3019] [Entered: 02/25/2022 02:44 PM]
February 25, 2022 [10895247] Designation of record filed by Appellant Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. Served on 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3019] PN [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:59 AM]
February 25, 2022 [10895245] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. Served on 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3019] PN [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:57 AM]
February 25, 2022 [10895242] Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez to continue appointment. Served on: 02/25/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-3019] PN [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:55 AM]
February 24, 2022 [10894954] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Paige Nichols and Ms. Melody Brannon for Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. [22-3019] [Entered: 02/24/2022 09:23 AM]
February 24, 2022 [10894931] Entry of appearance submitted by Paige A. Nichols for Appellant Mr. Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/24/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3019]--[Edited 02/24/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] PN [Entered: 02/24/2022 08:41 AM]
February 16, 2022 [10893234] Entry of appearance submitted by James A. Brown for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/16/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/16/22][22-3019] JAB [Entered: 02/16/2022 07:55 AM]
February 16, 2022 [10893250] Entry of appearance submitted by Carrie N. Capwell for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3019] --[Edited 02/16/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] CNC [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:10 AM]
February 16, 2022 [10893256] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. James A. Brown for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-3019] [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:14 AM]
February 16, 2022 [10893266] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Carrie N. Capwell for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-3019] [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:23 AM]
February 11, 2022 [10892537] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/11/2022. Docketing statement due 02/25/2022 for Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. Transcript order form due 02/25/2022 for Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. Notice of appearance due on 02/25/2022 for Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez and United States of America. A/Pet designation of record due 02/25/2022 for Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. Appointment motion due 02/25/2022 by Omar Francisco Orduno-Ramirez. [22-3019] [Entered: 02/11/2022 02:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Orduno-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: James A. Brown
Represented By: Carrie N. Capwell
Represented By: Annette B. Gurney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OMAR FRANCISCO ORDUNO-RAMIREZ
Represented By: Melody Brannon
Represented By: Paige Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?