South Broward Hospital Dist v. ELAP Services
Defendant: ELAP SERVICES and GROUP & PENSION ADMINISTATORS, a Texas Corporation
Petitioner / Appellant: MBA BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS
Respondent / Appellee: SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICT, DBA Memorial Healthcare System
Case Number: 22-4004
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order [10898045] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Briscoe and Eid granting Appellee's motion to dismiss case. Served on 03/10/2022. Text only entry - no attachment. See order at case termination. [22-4004] [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:16 AM]
March 10, 2022 [10898054] Jurisdictional Defect.(CMM) Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Bacharach, Briscoe and Eid. [22-4004] [Entered: 03/10/2022 09:29 AM]
March 8, 2022 [10897642] Reply filed by South Broward Hospital District to MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Served on 03/08/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4004] TJL [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:50 PM]
March 2, 2022 [10896421] Response filed by MBA Benefit Administrators to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. Served on 03/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4004] JAB [Entered: 03/02/2022 06:25 PM]
February 24, 2022 [10895076] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 02/24/2022. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/24/2022 01:17 PM]
February 23, 2022 [10894588] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Laura Robinson. Notice due that record is complete by 03/02/2022 for Kimberly A. Free, Clerk of Court. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/23/2022 08:12 AM]
February 17, 2022 [10893589] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dean Malik and Mr. Patrick C. Timoney for MBA Benefit Administrators. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4004] [Entered: 02/17/2022 07:37 AM]
February 17, 2022 [10893593] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffery A. Balls and Mr. Bentley J. Tolk for MBA Benefit Administrators. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/17/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/17/2022 07:43 AM]
February 17, 2022 [10893666] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 03/03/2022 for Laura Robinson. 1/12/22 Motion to Quash Hearing (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4004] [Entered: 02/17/2022 09:16 AM]
February 16, 2022 [10893571] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by MBA Benefit Administrators. Transcript ordered: Motion to Quash Hearing held January 12, 2022. Served on: 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004] BJT [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:58 PM]
February 16, 2022 [10893570] Docketing statement filed by MBA Benefit Administrators. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004] BJT [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:55 PM]
February 16, 2022 [10893569] Entry of appearance submitted by Dean H. Malik, and Patrick C. Timoney for Appellant MBA Benefit Administrators for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/17/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/17/22][22-4004] JAB [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:49 PM]
February 16, 2022 [10893561] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. The Appellant is directed to file a response to Appellee's motion to dismiss appeal. Response due on 03/02/2022 for MBA Benefit Administrators. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Served on 02/16/2022. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/16/2022 05:02 PM]
February 16, 2022 [10893568] Entry of appearance submitted by Bentley J. Tolk, and Jeffery A. Balls for Appellant MBA Benefit Administrators for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004] --[Edited 02/17/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JAB [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:45 PM]
February 15, 2022 This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Duplicate submission. [10893081] Entry of appearance submitted by Tal J. Lifshitz for Appellee South Broward Hospital District for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004] TJL [Entered: 02/15/2022 12:06 PM]
February 15, 2022 [10893093] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric Samuel Kay and Mr. Tal J. Lifshitz for South Broward Hospital District. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all parties previously disclosed). Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-4004] [Entered: 02/15/2022 12:20 PM]
February 15, 2022 [10893084] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric S. Kay for Appellee South Broward Hospital District for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/15/2022. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/15/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 02/15/22][22-4004] ESK [Entered: 02/15/2022 12:08 PM]
February 15, 2022 [10893211] Motion filed by Appellee South Broward Hospital District to dismiss case. Served on: 02/15/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4004] CRD [Entered: 02/15/2022 05:55 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892781] Returned mail filed. Addressed To: attorney Omar Mazien Ali-Shamaa. Reason Returned: not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward. Document Returned: Case opening leter. Action Taken: None. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:06 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892869] Entry of appearance submitted by Chad R. Derum for Appellee South Broward Hospital District for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CRD [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:46 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892875] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Chad Robert Derum for South Broward Hospital District. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 02/14/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:54 PM]
February 10, 2022 [10892396] Amended notice of appeal filed. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/11/2022 09:00 AM]
February 2, 2022 [10890136] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/01/2022. Docketing statement due 02/16/2022 for MBA Benefit Administrators. Transcript order form due 02/16/2022 for MBA Benefit Administrators. Notice of appearance due on 02/16/2022 for MBA Benefit Administrators and South Broward Hospital District. [22-4004] [Entered: 02/02/2022 08:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: South Broward Hospital Dist v. ELAP Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MBA BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS
Represented By: Dean Malik
Represented By: Patrick Timoney
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Represented By: Patrick C. Timoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SOUTH BROWARD HOSPITAL DISTRICT, DBA Memorial Healthcare System
Represented By: Omar Mazien Ali-Shamaa
Represented By: Chad Robert Derum Esq.
Represented By: Frank Florio
Represented By: Eric Samuel Kay
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz
Represented By: Michael Robert Lorigas
Represented By: Gail Ann McQuilkin
Represented By: Danya Pincavage
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Douglas Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAP SERVICES
Represented By: Kristopher R. Alderman
Represented By: Patrick M. Emery
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Represented By: Irene Oria
Represented By: Robert Thomas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GROUP & PENSION ADMINISTATORS, a Texas Corporation
Represented By: Kristopher R. Alderman
Represented By: Patrick M. Emery
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Represented By: Irene Oria
Represented By: Robert Thomas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?