Barrick v. Parker-Migliorini International
Plaintiff / Appellee: USA EX REL BRANDON BARRICK and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EX REL BRANDON BARRICK
Defendant / Appellant: PARKER-MIGLIORINI INTERNATIONAL LLC
Case Number: 22-4049
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 [10924764] Notice filed that the transcripts of the motions hearings held on 12/09/2015 and 05/02/2016 were filed by R. Edward Young in district court on 11/01/2016. Other transcripts remain due 08/22/2022. Text only entry; no document attached. [22-4049] [Entered: 07/07/2022 08:34 AM]
June 28, 2022 [10922756] Entry of appearance submitted by Katie Panzer, April Hollingsworth for Appellee Mr. Brandon Barrick for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/28/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049]--[Edited 06/28/2022 by JM PDF removed field 6/28/22. KAP [Entered: 06/28/2022 01:55 PM]
June 28, 2022 [10922831] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. April Lynn Hollingsworth and Katherine Allyce Panzer for Mr. Brandon Barrick. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/28/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049] [Entered: 06/28/2022 03:07 PM]
June 28, 2022 [10922908] Docketing statement filed by Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Served on 06/28/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049] MRG [Entered: 06/28/2022 06:06 PM]
June 28, 2022 [10922909] Notice filed by Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Served on 06/28/2022 by email. [22-4049] MRG [Entered: 06/28/2022 06:24 PM]
June 23, 2022 [10921743] Transcript order form filed by Patti Walker and Transcripts due 08/22/2022 for Patti Walker.(6/22/21 FPT, 6/25/21 Voir Dire and 6/28-30/21 & 7/1-2/21 trial proceedings) [22-4049] [Entered: 06/23/2022 11:42 AM]
June 22, 2022 [10921585] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 07/06/2022 for Patti Walker. See attachment to tof filed 6/22/22. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4049] [Entered: 06/22/2022 02:44 PM]
June 22, 2022 [10921513] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Transcript ordered: Voir dire-6/25/21; trial proceedings-6/28-30/21, 7/1-2/21; jury inst., opening/closing statements (captured in trial proceedings); US Dist Ct hrgs 12/9/15, 5/2/16, 6/22/21, 6/25/21, 6/28/21, 6/29/21, 6/30/21, 7/1/21, 7/2/21-see attached for more details. Served on: 06/22/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049] MRG [Entered: 06/22/2022 11:40 AM]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order [10921215] Order filed by Judges Bacharach and Moritz denying appellant's motion for stay filed by Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Served on 06/21/2022. [22-4049] [Entered: 06/21/2022 02:16 PM]
June 16, 2022 This entry has been removed from the docket as a duplicate. [SLS] [10920636] Entry of appearance submitted by Jason D. Boren for Appellant Parker-Migliorini International LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049] JDB [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:43 PM]
June 16, 2022 [10920634] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark R. Gaylord for Appellant Parker-Migliorini International LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049]--[Edited 06/16/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] MRG [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:41 PM]
June 16, 2022 [10920644] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jason D. Boren and Mr. Mark R. Gaylord for Parker-Migliorini International LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 06/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4049] [Entered: 06/16/2022 04:01 PM]
June 16, 2022 [10920668] Motion filed by Appellant Parker-Migliorini International LLC for stay of Judgment Pending Appeal. Served on: 06/16/2022. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4049] MRG [Entered: 06/16/2022 05:53 PM]
June 16, 2022 [10920669] Appellant's appendix filed by Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Total number of volumes filed: 3. Served on 06/16/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4049] MRG [Entered: 06/16/2022 05:57 PM]
June 14, 2022 [10919979] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/14/2022 Docketing statement due 06/28/2022 for Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Transcript order form due 06/28/2022 for Parker-Migliorini International LLC. Notice of appearance due on 06/28/2022 for Brandon Barrick and Parker-Migliorini International LLC [22-4049] [Entered: 06/14/2022 05:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Barrick v. Parker-Migliorini International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: USA EX REL BRANDON BARRICK
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw
Represented By: April Lynn Hollingsworth
Represented By: Katherine Allyce Panzer
Represented By: Ann Marie Taliaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EX REL BRANDON BARRICK
Represented By: James C. Bradshaw
Represented By: April Lynn Hollingsworth
Represented By: Katherine Allyce Panzer
Represented By: Ann Marie Taliaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PARKER-MIGLIORINI INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: Jason D. Boren Esq.
Represented By: Mark R. Gaylord Esq.
Represented By: Isiuwa Jacqueline Mabatah
Represented By: Steven W. Suflas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?