Gardner v. Long
Counter Defendant: EDSON G. GARDNER
Counter Claimant: WENDI LONG, in her official capacity as Treasurer for Uintah County, Utah
Case Number: 22-4071
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 27, 2023 Gardner v. Long

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 [10942097] Minute order filed - the brief submitted by appellee is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing. Appellant's optional reply brief now due 10/17/2022 for Edson G. Gardner. Paper copies of appellee's brief due 09/28/2022 by Wendi Long. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4071] [Entered: 09/21/2022 09:21 AM]
September 21, 2022 [10942090] Appellee/Respondent's brief filed by Wendi Long. Served on: 09/21/2022. Manner of service: US mail. Oral argument requested? No. Word/page count: 7969. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4071] JCT [Entered: 09/21/2022 09:12 AM]
September 2, 2022 [10938042] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 09/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4071] [Entered: 09/02/2022 12:41 PM]
August 25, 2022 [10936215] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4, Comments: Vols1-4 pleadings. [22-4071] [Entered: 08/25/2022 10:39 AM]
August 22, 2022 [10935329] Appellant's brief filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner. Original and 5 copies. Served on 08/22/2022 by email. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. Appellee's brief due 09/21/2022 for Wendi Long. [22-4071] [Entered: 08/22/2022 02:53 PM]
August 22, 2022 [10935320] Miscellaneous correspondence received from Mr. Edson G. Gardner but not filed. Dated: 08/18/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. Attached response sent. [22-4071] [Entered: 08/22/2022 02:43 PM]
August 17, 2022 [10934254] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp forms and appellant's opening brief due by 09/26/2022 for Edson G. Gardner. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 09/07/2022. [22-4071] [Entered: 08/17/2022 11:51 AM]
August 17, 2022 [10934244] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [22-4071] [Entered: 08/17/2022 11:45 AM]
August 12, 2022 [10933326] Opening brief received from Mr. Edson G. Gardner but not filed (as it is premature; fees due in district court). Served on 08/08/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-4071] --[Edited 08/22/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry; the brief has been filed.] [Entered: 08/12/2022 01:50 PM]
August 5, 2022 [10931825] Entry of appearance submitted by Jesse C. Trentadue for Appellee Wendi Long for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/05/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 08/05/2022 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 08/05/22][22-4071] JCT [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:34 AM]
August 5, 2022 [10931828] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jesse Carl Trentadue for Wendi Long. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/05/2022. Manner of Service: US mail [22-4071] [Entered: 08/05/2022 09:38 AM]
August 4, 2022 [10931558] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edson G. Gardner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/02/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-4071] [Entered: 08/04/2022 11:09 AM]
July 28, 2022 [10929990] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/28/2022 Notice of appearance due on 08/29/2022 for Edson G. Gardner, and Notice of appearance due on 08/11/2022 for Wendi Long. Fee or ifp forms due 08/29/2022 for Edson G. Gardner [22-4071] [Entered: 07/28/2022 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gardner v. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: EDSON G. GARDNER
Represented By: Edson G. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: WENDI LONG, in her official capacity as Treasurer for Uintah County, Utah
Represented By: Jesse Carl Trentadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?