United States v. Duncan
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: JACKIE DUNCAN
Case Number: 22-6005
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions -Vacate Sentence
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 [10893727] Appellant's combined opening brief and application for certificate of appealability filed by Jackie Duncan. Original and clerk made 4 copies. Served on 02/13/2022 by US mail. [22-6005] [Entered: 02/17/2022 11:30 AM]
January 24, 2022 [10887877] Entry of appearance filed by Jackie Duncan. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/24/2022. Manner of Service: US mail [22-6005] [Entered: 01/24/2022 11:45 AM]
January 13, 2022 [10885671] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Wilson D. McGarry for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/13/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6005] [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:00 AM]
January 13, 2022 [10885669] Entry of appearance submitted by Wilson D. McGarry for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/13/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6005]--[Edited 01/13/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] WDM [Entered: 01/13/2022 10:53 AM]
January 12, 2022 [10885409] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 6. Volumes 1-5 - pleadings; volume 6 - SEALED pleadings. [22-6005] [Entered: 01/12/2022 01:26 PM]
January 11, 2022 [10885120] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and Certificate of Appealability due 02/22/2022 for Jackie Duncan. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/01/2022. [22-6005] [Entered: 01/11/2022 04:13 PM]
January 11, 2022 [10885089] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/11/2022. Notice of appearance due on 02/10/2022 for Jack Duncan and on 01/25/2022 for United States of America. [22-6005] [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew P. Anderson
Represented By: Virginia Loreen Hines
Represented By: Edward Joseph Kumiega Esq.
Represented By: Wilson D. McGarry
Represented By: Timothy W. Ogilvie
Represented By: Mark Stoneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JACKIE DUNCAN
Represented By: Jackie Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?