United States v. Christian
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: JAMES CORNELIUS CHRISTIAN
Case Number: 22-6016
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions -Vacate Sentence

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 6, 2022 United States v. Christian

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 [10899079] Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Without Prepayment of Costs or Fees non plra received from James Cornelius Christian but not filed. Fee paid on 3/4/22. Served on 03/10/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6016] [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:55 AM]
March 8, 2022 [10897613] Supplementary Brief to 2/14/22 Motion to Appeal received from James Cornelius Christian but not filed. Original only. Served on 03/01/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6016] [Entered: 03/08/2022 02:52 PM]
March 8, 2022 [10897637] Order filed by Clerk of the Court directing Appellant to file a response to clarify which documents he wishes the court to consider as his COA brief. See order for details. Response due on 04/06/2022 for James Cornelius Christian. Served on 03/08/2022. [22-6016] [Entered: 03/08/2022 03:36 PM]
March 4, 2022 [10896909] Fee paid. Date paid in District Court on 03/04/2022. [22-6016] [Entered: 03/04/2022 03:00 PM]
February 28, 2022 [10895565] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 3, Comments: Volumes I & II - Pleadings, Volume III - Sealed Pleadings. [22-6016] [Entered: 02/28/2022 09:51 AM]
February 25, 2022 [10895363] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or IFP forms and appellant's combined opening brief and application for certificate of appealability due 04/06/2022 for James Cornelius Christian. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 03/18/2022. [22-6016] [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:48 PM]
February 25, 2022 [10895360] Motion for leave to 28 U.S.C. 1915 received from James Cornelius Christian but not filed. Served on 02/25/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6016] [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:46 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892853]Motion to appeal with exhibits received from James Cornelius Christian but not filed. Served on 02/10/2022. (Court only.) Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6016] [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:11 PM]
February 14, 2022 [10892836] Entry of appearance filed by James Cornelius Christian. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/10/2022. Manner of Service: US mail [22-6016] [Entered: 02/14/2022 01:36 PM]
January 26, 2022 [10888592] Entry of appearance submitted by Jacquelyn M. Hutzell for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/26/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6016]--[Edited 01/26/2022 by JM PDF removed filed 1/26/22.] JMH [Entered: 01/26/2022 03:04 PM]
January 26, 2022 [10888633] Entry of appearance filed by Jacquelyn Mather Hutzell for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/26/2022. Manner of Service: US mail. [22-6016] [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:22 PM]
January 26, 2022 [10888449] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/25/2022. Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due on 02/25/2022 for James Cornelius Christian. Notice of appearance due on 02/09/2022 for United States of America. [22-6016] [Entered: 01/26/2022 09:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States v. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jacquelyn Mather Hutzell
Represented By: David Patrick Petermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES CORNELIUS CHRISTIAN
Represented By: James Cornelius Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?