Pantaleo v. S. C. Johnson & Son
Plaintiff: VALERIE C. HARRIS PANTALEO
Defendant: S. C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.
Case Number: 24-1246
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2024 [11103369] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [24-1246] [Entered: 07/09/2024 06:43 AM]
July 9, 2024 [11103371] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp forms, opening brief, and notice of appearance due by 08/19/2024 for Valerie C. Harris Pantaleo. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 07/30/2024 [24-1246] [Entered: 07/09/2024 06:45 AM]
July 9, 2024 [11103387] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 5, Comments: Volume 1 - Pleadings Volume 2 - Pleadings Volume 3 - Pleadings Volume 4 - Sealed Pleadings Volume 5 - Transcript (90 day restriction). [24-1246] [Entered: 07/09/2024 08:00 AM]
June 18, 2024 [11098640] Entry of appearance submitted by Meghan Frei Berglind for Appellee S. C. Johnson & Son, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/18/2024. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [24-1246]--[Edited 06/18/2024 by JM PDF removed filed.] MFB [Entered: 06/18/2024 02:26 PM]
June 18, 2024 [11098642] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by S. C. Johnson & Son, Inc.. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 06/18/2024. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [24-1246] MFB [Entered: 06/18/2024 02:28 PM]
June 18, 2024 [11098698] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Meghan Frei Berglind for S. C. Johnson & Son, Inc.. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/18/2024. Manner of Service: US mail, email [24-1246] [Entered: 06/18/2024 04:35 PM]
June 7, 2024 [11096360] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/07/2024 Fee or ifp forms and notice of appearance due 07/08/2024 for Valerie C. Harris Pantaleo. Disclosure statement and notice of appearance due on 06/21/2024 for S. C. Johnson & Son, Inc.. [24-1246] [Entered: 06/07/2024 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pantaleo v. S. C. Johnson & Son
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE C. HARRIS PANTALEO
Represented By: Valerie C. Harris Pantaleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.
Represented By: Meghan Frei Berglind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?