Jacobs v. Salt Lake International Airport
Plaintiff: ERIKA JACOBS
Defendant: SALT LAKE INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT
Case Number: 24-4115
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2024 Filing 6 [11141231] Jurisdictional Defect. Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, unsigned, unpublished; Judges Phillips, McHugh and Rossman. [24-4115] [Entered: 12/03/2024 03:17 PM]
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 [11140687] Response filed by Erika Jacobs to 11/15/24 Order. Served on 11/27/2024. Manner of Service: US mail. [24-4115] [Entered: 12/02/2024 12:03 PM]
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 [11140684] Consent to electronic service filed by filed by Erika Jacobs. Served on 11/27/2024. Manner of Service: US mail. [24-4115] [Entered: 12/02/2024 11:59 AM]
December 2, 2024 Filing 3 [11140681] Entry of appearance filed by Erika Jacobs. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/27/2024. Manner of Service: US mail [24-4115] [Entered: 12/02/2024 11:53 AM]
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 [11137083] Jurisdiction challenged. Response to 11/15/2024 order due on 12/06/2024 for Erika Jacobs [24-4115] [Entered: 11/15/2024 12:41 PM]
November 15, 2024 Filing 1 [11136971] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/15/2024 Notice of appearance due on 12/16/2024 for Erika Jacobs. [24-4115] [Entered: 11/15/2024 10:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Salt Lake International Airport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALT LAKE INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIKA JACOBS
Represented By: Erika Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?