Wells v. Galfab, et al
Plaintiff: BRITANEY NICOLE WELLS, on behalf of the Estate of Michael Scott Hayes, deceased
Defendant: GALFAB LLC, GALFAB HOLDINGS INC and PREMIER TRUCK SALES & RENTAL INC
Case Number: 24-6192
Filed: September 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2024 Filing 16 [11134331] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 12/13/2024 for Britaney Nicole Wells. [24-6192] [Entered: 11/05/2024 03:30 PM]
October 4, 2024 Filing 15 [11126445] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 10/04/2024. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 11/13/2024 for Britaney Nicole Wells [24-6192] [Entered: 10/04/2024 03:50 PM]
October 4, 2024 Filing 14 [11126422] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 10/04/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6192] BAC [Entered: 10/04/2024 03:24 PM]
October 4, 2024 Filing 13 [11126415] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bart Alan Chancellor for Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/04/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6192] [Entered: 10/04/2024 03:13 PM]
October 4, 2024 Filing 12 [11126409] Entry of appearance submitted by Bart A. Chancellor for Appellee Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 10/04/2024. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 10/04/2024 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 10/04/24][24-6192] BAC [Entered: 10/04/2024 03:04 PM]
October 3, 2024 Filing 11 [11125898] Deficiency notice issued.. Notice of appearance and Disclosure statement now due on 10/07/2024 for Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc [24-6192] [Entered: 10/03/2024 09:29 AM]
October 2, 2024 Filing 10 [11125783] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/25/2024 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [24-6192] [Entered: 10/02/2024 03:20 PM]
October 1, 2024 Filing 9 [11125214] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 10/08/2024 for Joan Kane. (Text Only - No Attachment) [24-6192] [Entered: 10/01/2024 10:46 AM]
October 1, 2024 Filing 8 [11125209] Notice received from Britaney Nicole Wells that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 10/01/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6192] HMH [Entered: 10/01/2024 10:43 AM]
October 1, 2024 Filing 7 [11125202] Docketing statement filed by Britaney Nicole Wells. Served on 10/01/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6192] HMH [Entered: 10/01/2024 10:38 AM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 6 [11123426] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. John Clark Lennon, Mr. Gerald P. Green, and Ms. Hailey M. Hopper for Britaney Nicole Wells. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/24/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6192] [Entered: 09/24/2024 05:16 PM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 5 [11123409] Entry of appearance submitted by Hailey M. Hopper, Gerald P. Green for Appellant Britaney Nicole Wells for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/24/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6192]--[Edited 09/24/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 09/24/2024] GPG [Entered: 09/24/2024 04:06 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 4 [11123086] Entry of appearance filed by Cody A. Reihs and Derrick T. DeWitt for Galfab LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/23/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6192] [Entered: 09/23/2024 05:56 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 3 [11122855] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Galfab LLC. More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 09/23/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6192] CAR [Entered: 09/23/2024 12:59 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 2 [11122849] Entry of appearance submitted by Derrick T. DeWitt; and Cody A. Reihs for Appellee Galfab LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/23/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6192]--[Edited 09/23/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 09/23/2024] CAR [Entered: 09/23/2024 12:57 PM]
September 17, 2024 Filing 1 [11121351] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/16/2024 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 10/01/2024 for Britaney Nicole Wells. Notice of appearance and disclosure statement due on 10/01/2024 for Galfab LLC and Premier Truck Sales & Rental Inc. [24-6192] [Entered: 09/17/2024 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wells v. Galfab, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALFAB LLC
Represented By: Cody A. Reihs
Represented By: Derrick T. DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GALFAB HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: Cody A. Reihs
Represented By: Derrick T. DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER TRUCK SALES & RENTAL INC
Represented By: Derrick T. DeWitt
Represented By: Bart Alan Chancellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITANEY NICOLE WELLS, on behalf of the Estate of Michael Scott Hayes, deceased
Represented By: John Clark Lennon
Represented By: Hailey M. Hopper
Represented By: Gerald P. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?