Underwood v. Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN R. UNDERWOOD
Defendant: OKLAHOMA PARDON AND PAROLE BOARD, TOM BATES, in his official capacity as Director of the Pardon and Parole Board and RICHARD MILLER, in his official capacity as Chairperson of the Pardon and Parole Board
Case Number: 24-6259
Filed: December 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 [11146543] Order filed by Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Rossman granting Appellant's motion to dismiss. Served on 12/23/2024. Text only entry - no attachment. (see case termination order) [24-6259] [Entered: 12/23/2024 04:26 PM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 18 [11146540] Mandate issued. [24-6259] [Entered: 12/23/2024 04:20 PM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 17 [11146539] Frap 42; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Rossman. [24-6259] [Entered: 12/23/2024 04:18 PM]
December 23, 2024 Filing 16 [11146262] Motion filed by Appellant Kevin R. Underwood to dismiss case. Served on: 12/23/2024. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6259] BMV [Entered: 12/23/2024 09:42 AM]
December 18, 2024 Filing 15 [11145287] Petition for writ of certiorari filed by Kevin R. Underwood on 12/17/2024 and placed on the Supreme Court docket 12/17/2024 as Supreme Court Number 24-6159. [24-6259] [Entered: 12/18/2024 03:32 PM]
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [11143565] Order filed by Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Rossman lifting the court's temporary stay and denying appellant's motion for stay of clemency proceedings. Judge Rossman would grant the motion. See order for details. Served on 12/11/2024. [24-6259] [Entered: 12/11/2024 08:00 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 13 [11143501] Response to Notice filed by Mr. Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board. Served on 12/11/2024 by email. [24-6259]--[Edited 12/11/2024 by ART to correct event and add text] ZPW [Entered: 12/11/2024 03:15 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 12 [11143500] Entry of appearance filed by Kyle Peppler for Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Richard Miller and Mr. Tom Bates. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/11/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6259] [Entered: 12/11/2024 03:13 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 11 [11143497] Entry of appearance filed by Zachary Paul West and Garry Michael Gaskins, II for Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Richard Miller and Mr. Tom Bates. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/11/2024. Manner of Service: email [24-6259] [Entered: 12/11/2024 03:10 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 10 [11143485] Entry of appearance submitted by Kyle Thomas Peppler for Appellees Mr. Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/11/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6259]--[Edited 12/11/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 12/11/2024] KP [Entered: 12/11/2024 02:50 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 9 [11143483] Entry of appearance submitted by Garry Michael Gaskins, II and Zachary Paul West for Appellees Mr. Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/11/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6259]--[Edited 12/11/2024 by ART to remove pdf as pleading was filed on 12/11/2024] GMG [Entered: 12/11/2024 02:47 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 8 [11143361] Notice filed by Kevin R. Underwood. Served on 12/11/2024 by email. [24-6259] BMV [Entered: 12/11/2024 12:07 PM]
December 11, 2024 Filing 7 [11143181] Notice of scheduling of new clemency hearing date and assurance of compliance filed by Mr. Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board. Served on 12/11/2024 by email. [24-6259]--[Edited 12/11/2024 by ART to add text] ZPW [Entered: 12/11/2024 08:03 AM]
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 [11143097] Reply filed by Kevin R. Underwood to Appellee's Response in Opposition to Underwood's Emergency Request for Stay of Clemency Proceedings and Execution. Served on 12/10/2024. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6259] BMV [Entered: 12/10/2024 02:54 PM]
December 9, 2024 Filing 5 [11142712] Response filed by Mr. Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board to EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR STAY OF CLEMENCY PROCEEDINGS AND EXECUTION. Served on 12/09/2024. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [24-6259] ZPW [Entered: 12/09/2024 02:53 PM]
December 9, 2024 Filing 4 [11142662] District court order granting plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (DC Doc. No. 2). [24-6259] [Entered: 12/09/2024 01:52 PM]
December 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 [11142427] Order filed by Judges Matheson, Bacharach and Rossman. Response to appellant's motion for stay due on or before 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time on 12/09/2024 for Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board. Reply due on or before 4:00 p.m. Central Standard Time on 12/10/2024 by Kevin R. Underwood. The court enters a temporary stay of clemency proceedings scheduled for 12/09/2024. Served on 12/09/2024. [24-6259] --[Edited 12/09/2024 by SLS to correct filing date and to correct time of reply deadline.] [Entered: 12/09/2024 08:14 AM]
December 8, 2024 Filing 2 [11142425] Appellant's motion filed by Kevin Underwood for stay of clemency proceedings and execution. Served on 12/09/2024. Manner of Service: email. [24-6259] [Entered: 12/09/2024 08:06 AM]
December 8, 2024 Filing 1 [11142423] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/08/2024. Notice of appearance, transcript order form, designation of record, docketing statement and appointment motion due 12/23/2024 by Kevin Underwood. Notice of appearance due on 12/23/2024 for Tom Bates, Richard Miller and Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board. [24-6259]--[Edited to add docketing statement 12/09/2024 by SLS] [Entered: 12/09/2024 07:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Underwood v. Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN R. UNDERWOOD
Represented By: Brendan Mathew Van Winkle
Represented By: Emma Victoria Rolls
Represented By: Hunter S. Labovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKLAHOMA PARDON AND PAROLE BOARD
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Kyle Peppler
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM BATES, in his official capacity as Director of the Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Kyle Peppler
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MILLER, in his official capacity as Chairperson of the Pardon and Parole Board
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Kyle Peppler
Represented By: Garry Michael Gaskins II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?