John Sekula, et al v. Residential Credit Solutions,, et al
Defendant / Appellee: AMERICAN WESTERN HOME INSURANCE, a.k.a. American Western Home Insurance Company and RESIDENTIAL CREDIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JACQUELINE SEKULA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and JOHN C. SEKULA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 16-17451
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellants Jacqueline Sekula and John C. Sekula's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 04/19/2017 12:16 PM]
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellants John C. Sekula and Jacqueline Sekula is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8099101-2 ], [ # 8099101-3 ] [Entered: 04/19/2017 12:15 PM]
April 14, 2017 Amended Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice [ # 8099101-2 ] filed by Appellants Jacqueline Sekula and John C. Sekula. ---[Edited 04/17/2017 by SB] (ECF: Cristina Pierson) [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:36 AM]
April 13, 2017 Notice of deficient Motion filed by Cristina Maria Pierson for John C. Sekula and Jacqueline Sekula. Document does not contain a Certificate of Compliance, see FRAP 32(g)(1) for the "word" count. Counsel must file a corrected motion using the Amend, Correct or Supplement Motion event within 3 days. PLEASE DO NOT CHANGE THE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE. [Entered: 04/13/2017 03:34 PM]
April 12, 2017 MOTION Dismissal with Prejudice, Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Jacqueline Sekula and John C. Sekula. Motion is Unopposed. [8099101-1] (ECF: Cristina Pierson) [Entered: 04/12/2017 05:01 PM]
January 24, 2017 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jessica Diane Ray Gallegos for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Jessica Gallegos) [Entered: 01/24/2017 06:40 PM]
January 20, 2017 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Elizabeth Joy Campbell for Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 01/20/2017 02:11 PM]
January 5, 2017 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael Sebastain Vitale for Appellee American Western Home Insurance. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Michael Vitale) [Entered: 01/05/2017 04:14 PM]
December 27, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Robert Thompson Mowrey for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. in 16-17451. [Entered: 12/27/2016 11:41 AM]
December 27, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Elizabeth Joy Campbell for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. in 16-17451. [Entered: 12/27/2016 11:41 AM]
December 27, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Jessica Diane Ray Gallegos for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. in 16-17451. [Entered: 12/27/2016 11:40 AM]
December 22, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Robert Thompson Mowrey for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. in 16-17451. [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:52 AM]
December 22, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Elizabeth Joy Campbell for Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. in 16-17451. [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:51 AM]
December 22, 2016 Added Attorney(s) Jessica Diane Ray Gallegos for party(s) Appellee Residential Credit Solutions, Inc., in case 16-17451. [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:49 AM]
December 22, 2016 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Jacqueline Sekula and John C. Sekula. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/17/2017. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:17 AM]
December 22, 2016 Appellate fee was paid on 12/14/2016 as to Appellant Jacqueline Sekula. [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:04 AM]
December 21, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jessica D. Gallegos Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. (ECF: Jessica Gallegos) [Entered: 12/21/2016 02:53 PM]
December 15, 2016 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Cristina Maria Pierson for Appellants John C. Sekula and Jacqueline Sekula. No hearings. (ECF: Cristina Pierson) [Entered: 12/15/2016 01:27 PM]
December 15, 2016 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Cristina Maria Pierson for Appellants John C. Sekula and Jacqueline Sekula. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Cristina Pierson) [Entered: 12/15/2016 01:25 PM]
December 15, 2016 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Cristina Maria Pierson for Appellants John C. Sekula and Jacqueline Sekula. (ECF: Cristina Pierson) [Entered: 12/15/2016 01:23 PM]
December 15, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cristina Maria Pierson for John C. Sekula and Jacqueline Sekula. (ECF: Cristina Pierson) [Entered: 12/15/2016 01:22 PM]
December 14, 2016 E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Michael Sebastain Vitale for Appellee American Western Home Insurance in 16-17451. [Entered: 12/14/2016 08:14 AM]
December 13, 2016 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Sebastain Vitale for American Western Home Insurance. (ECF: Michael Vitale) [Entered: 12/13/2016 03:45 PM]
December 8, 2016 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Jacqueline Sekula and John C. Sekula on 12/07/2016. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 12/22/2016 as to Appellant Jacqueline Sekula. Awaiting Appellee's CIP due on or before 01/05/2017 as to Appellee American Western Home Insurance [Entered: 12/08/2016 02:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Sekula, et al v. Residential Credit Solutions,, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN WESTERN HOME INSURANCE, a.k.a. American Western Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Michael Sebastain Vitale
Represented By: Robert James Tucker
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RESIDENTIAL CREDIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jessica Diane Ray Gallegos
Represented By: Elizabeth Joy Campbell
Represented By: Robert Thompson Mowrey
Represented By: Christopher Boeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACQUELINE SEKULA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Cristina Maria Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN C. SEKULA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Cristina Maria Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: John J. Uustal
Represented By: Jordan M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?