Acheron Capital, Ltd., et al v. Barry Mukamal, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERTO MARTINEZ
Plaintiff / Appellant: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST and AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Undetermined: BARRY E. MUKAMAL
Case Number: 19-10166
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd. is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8685996-2 ] [Entered: 02/07/2019 03:58 PM]
February 7, 2019 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:01 PM]
February 4, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellant Styx Portfolio Trust. No hearings. [Entered: 02/04/2019 01:52 PM]
February 4, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/25/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:14 PM]
February 4, 2019 MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Acheron Capital, Ltd.. Motion is Unopposed. [8685996-1] [19-10166] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:30 PM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Suzanne Y. Labrit for Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd. [19-10166] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:48 PM]
January 28, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Suzanne Y. Labrit for Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10166] (ECF: Suzanne Labrit) [Entered: 01/28/2019 05:44 PM]
January 14, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust on 01/14/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/28/2019 as to Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2019 as to Appellees Roberto Martinez and Barry E. Mukamal [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Acheron Capital, Ltd., et al v. Barry Mukamal, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERTO MARTINEZ
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD.
Represented By: Suzanne Labrit
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Miranda Lundeen Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BARRY E. MUKAMAL
Represented By: David L. Rosendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?