U.S. Bank N.A. v. Richard Huff
Petitioner / Appellant: RICHARD HUFF
Plaintiff / Appellee: U.S. BANK N.A.
Case Number: 19-10194
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: This appeal is DISMISSED, sua sponte, for lack of jurisdiction. See Order for complete text. (CRW, JP and BCG) [Entered: 02/26/2019 11:23 AM]
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Greg S. Krivo, Counsel for the Appellee [19-10194] (ECF: Gregory Krivo) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:41 PM]
February 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Richard Huff. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:12 AM]
January 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Richard Huff. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:34 AM]
January 16, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Richard Huff on 01/14/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/25/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/30/2019 as to Appellant Richard Huff. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/13/2019 as to Appellee U.S. Bank N.A. [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. Richard Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RICHARD HUFF
Represented By: Richard Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: U.S. BANK N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan H. Kasper
Represented By: Gregory Scott Krivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?