Issac Potter, Jr. v. Florida Patients Compensations, et al
Defendant / Appellee: FLORIDA PATIENTS COMPENSATIONS FUND, JOSHUA STEPHANY, M.D., GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMS/SUNBELT, INC. and ORLANDO HEALTH, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ISSAC A. POTTER, JR.
Case Number: 19-10737
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gail C. Bradford for Joshua Stephany, M.D. [19-10737] (ECF: Gail Bradford) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:25 PM]
April 3, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Issac A. Potter, Jr. was filed on 04/01/2019. Docket Entry 20. [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:30 AM]
April 1, 2019 Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Issac A. Potter, Jr.. [Entered: 04/02/2019 10:03 AM]
March 25, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gary John Guzzi for Appellee Gerber Life Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10737] (ECF: Gary Guzzi) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:21 PM]
March 21, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Issac A. Potter, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/21/2019 11:31 AM]
March 14, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Issac A. Potter, Jr.. [Entered: 03/29/2019 03:43 PM]
March 6, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gideon Reitblat for Gerber Life Insurance Company [19-10737] (ECF: Gideon Reitblat) [Entered: 03/06/2019 01:58 PM]
March 6, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gary Guzzi for Gerber Life Insurance Company Gary John Guzzi for Gerber Life Insurance Company. [19-10737] (ECF: Gary Guzzi) [Entered: 03/06/2019 01:56 PM]
February 26, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Issac A. Potter, Jr. on 02/25/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/12/2019 as to Appellant Issac A. Potter Jr.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/26/2019 as to Appellee Florida Patients Compensations Fund [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Issac Potter, Jr. v. Florida Patients Compensations, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLORIDA PATIENTS COMPENSATIONS FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA STEPHANY, M.D.
Represented By: Gail C. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Gary John Guzzi
Represented By: Gideon Reitblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMS/SUNBELT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORLANDO HEALTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISSAC A. POTTER, JR.
Represented By: Issac A. Potter Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?