Litai Assets, LLC, et al v. Barry Mukamal
Plaintiff / Appellant: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD., LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST, ACHERON PORTFOLIO TRUST, STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST and AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Not Yet Classified: LITAI ASSETS, LLC
Case Number: 19-11447
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 21, 2020 Acheron Portfolio Trust, et al v. Mutual Benefits Corp., et al
January 6, 2022 Summary Acheron Capital, Ltd. v. Mukamal
October 17, 2022 Acheron Capital, Ltd. v. Barry Mukamal

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Barry E. Mukamal [19-11447] (ECF: David Rosendorf) [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:34 PM]
May 23, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust [19-11447] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:15 PM]
May 23, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Litai Assets, LLC [19-11447] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:15 PM]
May 16, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Arrastia for Barry Mukamal [19-11447] (ECF: John Arrastia) [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:10 PM]
May 16, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney David L. Rosendorf for Appellee Barry E. Mukamal. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11447] (ECF: David Rosendorf) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:53 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David L. Rosendorf for Barry E. Mukamal. [19-11447] (ECF: David Rosendorf) [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:41 PM]
May 9, 2019 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Litai Assets, LLC, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:31 PM]
May 2, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Litai Assets, LLC, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/02/2019 08:33 AM]
May 1, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Appellant Litai Assets, LLC. No hearings. [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:48 PM]
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry I. Glick for Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [19-11447] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:23 AM]
April 30, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Appellant Litai Assets, LLC. No hearings. [19-11447] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:48 PM]
April 30, 2019 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Litai Assets, LLC is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 04/30/2019 11:20 AM]
April 29, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust, Styx Portfolio Trust and Acheron Portfolio Trust. No hearings. [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:30 PM]
April 29, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [19-11447] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:11 PM]
April 29, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. No hearings. [19-11447] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:44 AM]
April 29, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Larry I. Glick for Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11447] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:40 AM]
April 29, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry I. Glick for Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust. [19-11447] (ECF: Larry Glick) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:29 AM]
April 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Larry I. Glick for Acheron Capital, Ltd.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:39 AM]
April 26, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Litai Assets, LLC Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Appellant Litai Assets, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11447] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:53 PM]
April 26, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Appellant Litai Assets, LLC. [19-11447] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:39 PM]
April 24, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey W. Gutchess for Litai Assets, LLC. [19-11447] (ECF: Jeffrey Gutchess) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:25 AM]
April 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Acheron Capital, Ltd., Acheron Portfolio Trust, Avernus Portfolio Trust, Lorenzo Tonti 2006 Trust and Styx Portfolio Trust on 04/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2019 as to Appellant Acheron Capital, Ltd. [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:14 PM]
April 12, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Litai Assets, LLC on 04/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2019 as to Appellant Litai Assets, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/10/2019 as to Appellee Barry E. Mukamal [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Litai Assets, LLC, et al v. Barry Mukamal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ACHERON CAPITAL, LTD.
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORENZO TONTI 2006 TRUST
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ACHERON PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STYX PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AVERNUS PORTFOLIO TRUST
Represented By: Larry I. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: William J. Gallwey III
Represented By: George G. Mahfood
Represented By: Charles A. Wachter
Represented By: J. David Bogenschutz
Represented By: Michael R. Band
Represented By: Eric Mathew Sodhi
Represented By: Myrna L. Maysonet
Represented By: Maxine M. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LITAI ASSETS, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?