Leah Caldwell v. Doris Downs, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WENDY L. SHOOB and DORIS L. DOWNS
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEAH CALDWELL
Case Number: 19-11751
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 15, 2019 Leah Caldwell v. Judge Doris L. Downs, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED: Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Leah Caldwell is returned unfiled because you failed to filled out the attached Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The CIP is incomplete. [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:23 PM]
June 14, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by Leah Caldwell. Service date: 06/12/2019. [Entered: 06/20/2019 10:04 AM]
June 14, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Leah Caldwell. [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:25 AM]
June 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Leah Caldwell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions. [Entered: 06/12/2019 04:26 PM]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Leah Caldwell. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:13 PM]
May 7, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Leah Caldwell on 05/03/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/17/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/21/2019 as to Appellant Leah Caldwell [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:07 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Leah Caldwell v. Doris Downs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WENDY L. SHOOB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DORIS L. DOWNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEAH CALDWELL
Represented By: Leah Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?