Terri Mollica v. USA
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner / Appellant: TERRI MCGUIRE MOLLICA
Case Number: 19-11771
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 MOTION for order of designation of record of appeal filed by Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8814679-1] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:58 PM]
June 14, 2019 USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica was filed on 06/13/2019. Docket Entry 28. [Entered: 06/14/2019 08:58 AM]
May 23, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael B. Billingsley for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11771] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 05/23/2019 10:53 AM]
May 22, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica was filed on 05/22/2019. Docket Entry 27. [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:10 PM]
May 20, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica. [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:42 PM]
May 20, 2019 Notice of Change of Address for Party Terri McGuire Mollica. [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:41 PM]
May 15, 2019 Notice of Change of Address for Party Terri McGuire Mollica. [Entered: 05/15/2019 02:24 PM]
May 9, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Billingsley for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama for USA. [19-11771] (ECF: Michael Billingsley) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:46 AM]
May 6, 2019 HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Terri McGuire Mollica on 05/06/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terri Mollica v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael B. Billingsley
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TERRI MCGUIRE MOLLICA
Represented By: Terri McGuire Mollica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?