USA v. Henry Arias

Defendant / Appellant: HENRY BONILLA ARIAS
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-11835
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 PSI filed by Attorney Stephen John Langs for Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:49 AM]
June 27, 2019 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:49 AM]
June 27, 2019 Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:48 AM]
June 26, 2019 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sean Siekkinen for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11835] (ECF: Sean Siekkinen) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:10 PM]
June 26, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sean Siekkinen for USA [19-11835] (ECF: Sean Siekkinen) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:09 PM]
June 26, 2019 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. [19-11835] (ECF: Stephen Langs) [Entered: 06/26/2019 01:22 PM]
June 26, 2019 Appellant's brief filed by Henry Bonilla Arias. [19-11835] (ECF: Stephen Langs) [Entered: 06/26/2019 11:51 AM]
May 30, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Todd B. Grandy for USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11835] (ECF: Todd Grandy) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:43 PM]
May 30, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Todd B. Grandy for USA [19-11835] (ECF: Todd Grandy) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:42 PM]
May 29, 2019 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/08/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:24 PM]
May 29, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Melissa A. Pierson, Filer: Henry B. Arias, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/29/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Sentencing 04/24/2019. [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:43 PM]
May 29, 2019 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Tracey V. Aurelio, Filer: Henry B. Arias, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 05/29/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Initial Appearance 11/05/2018, Plea Hearing 02/12/2019. [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:41 PM]
May 23, 2019 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Melissa A. Pierson, 05/23/2019, Henry B. Arias, Sentencing 04/24/2019. [Entered: 05/23/2019 03:34 PM]
May 23, 2019 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Tracey V. Aurelio, 05/23/2019, Henry B. Arias, Pre-Trial Proceedings 11/05/2018 , Plea Hearing 02/12/2019. [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:59 AM]
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Henry B. Arias, Court Reporter: Melissa A. Pierson, Proceeding Type and Date: Sentencing 04/24/2019. [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:58 AM]
May 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Henry B. Arias, Court Reporter: Tracey V. Aurelio, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 11/05/2018 , Plea Hearing 02/12/2019. [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:57 AM]
May 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Stephen John Langs for Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11835] (ECF: Stephen Langs) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:27 PM]
May 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Stephen John Langs for Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11835] (ECF: Stephen Langs) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:24 PM]
May 22, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stephen John Langs for Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11835] (ECF: Stephen Langs) [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:26 PM]
May 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen J. Langs for Appellant [19-11835] (ECF: Stephen Langs) [Entered: 05/20/2019 02:41 PM]
May 13, 2019 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Henry Bonilla Arias on 05/10/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Henry Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HENRY BONILLA ARIAS
Represented By: Donna Lee Elm
Represented By: Rosemary Cakmis
Represented By: Alec Fitzgerald Hall
Represented By: Stephen John Langs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sean Siekkinen
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Todd B. Grandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?