USA v. Quintavious Obie
Defendant / Appellant: QUINTAVIOUS OBIE
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-11853
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 The Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Quintavious Obie. The appellant is hereby notified that upon expiration of 14 days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the default has been corrected. [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:01 AM]
June 4, 2019 This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:59 AM]
June 3, 2019 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Manubir Singh Arora for Appellant Quintavious Obie, Eileen Nicole Moorman for Appellant Quintavious Obie and Party Quintavious Obie. [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:31 PM]
May 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Quintavious Obie. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:14 PM]
May 21, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jennifer Keen for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11853] (ECF: Jennifer Keen) [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:04 AM]
May 21, 2019 MOTION to seal filed by USA. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8778517-1] [19-11853] (ECF: Jennifer Keen) [Entered: 05/21/2019 11:01 AM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jennifer Keen for USA [19-11853] (ECF: Jennifer Keen) [Entered: 05/15/2019 04:21 PM]
May 15, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for USA [19-11853] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:49 AM]
May 13, 2019 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Quintavious Obie on 05/10/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Quintavious Obie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: QUINTAVIOUS OBIE
Represented By: Quintavious Obie
Represented By: Manubir Singh Arora
Represented By: Eileen Nicole Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth McBath
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
Represented By: Jennifer Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?