MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, et al v. Owners Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company, SERIES PMPI, A DESIGNATED SERIES OF MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC, A Delaware Series Limited Liability Company and MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES LLC, A Delaware Series Limited Liability Company,
Defendant / Appellee: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY and OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 19-12357
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Lori M. McAllister for Appellees-Cross Appellants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company and Southern-Owners Insurance Company. [19-12357] (ECF: Lori McAllister) [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:36 PM]
July 18, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Lori M. McAllister for Appellees-Cross Appellants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company and Southern-Owners Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12357] (ECF: Lori McAllister) [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:34 AM]
July 17, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Shannon Patricia McKenna for Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Southern-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company and Spencer H. Silverglate for Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Southern-Owners Insurance Company and Owners Insurance Company. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:31 PM]
July 3, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC. No hearings. [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:54 AM]
July 2, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC. No hearings. [19-12357] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 05:16 PM]
July 2, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC. [19-12357] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 05:15 PM]
July 2, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Arlenys Perdomo for Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12357] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 05:14 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon Patricia McKenna for Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company and Southern-Owners Insurance Company. [19-12357] (ECF: Spencer Silverglate) [Entered: 07/02/2019 05:09 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Arlenys Perdomo for MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC. [19-12357] (ECF: Arlenys Perdomo) [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:20 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Spencer H. Silverglate for Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company and Southern-Owners Insurance Company. [19-12357] (ECF: Spencer Silverglate) [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:20 PM]
July 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lori McAllister for Owners Insurance Company, Auto-Owners Insurance Company and Southern-Owners Insurance Company [19-12357] (ECF: Lori McAllister) [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:30 AM]
July 1, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellees-Cross Appellants Auto-Owners Insurance Company, Owners Insurance Company and Southern-Owners Insurance Company on 07/01/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/15/2019 as to Appellee-Cross Appellant Owners Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant-Cross Appellee MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC [Entered: 07/11/2019 10:33 AM]
July 1, 2019 MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-12029, 19-12091, 19-12085, 19-12092, 19-12358, and 19-12357 filed by Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC. Motion is Unopposed [8815929-1] [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:50 PM]
June 20, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC on 06/19/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/30/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/05/2019 as to Appellant MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/18/2019 as to Appellee Owners Insurance Company [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, et al v. Owners Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, A Florida Limited Liability Company
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Arlenys Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SERIES PMPI, A DESIGNATED SERIES OF MAO-MSO RECOVERY II LLC, A Delaware Series Limited Liability Company
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Arlenys Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES LLC, A Delaware Series Limited Liability Company,
Represented By: John H. Ruiz
Represented By: Arlenys Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Represented By: Shannon Patricia McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Represented By: Shannon Patricia McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Represented By: Shannon Patricia McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?