Mario Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital,, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARIO MUCCIOLO
Defendant / Appellee: BOCA RATON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., JOHN DOES and JANE DOES
Case Number: 19-12915
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 4, 2020 Mario Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc., et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Webber for Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.. [19-12915] (ECF: John Webber) [Entered: 09/06/2019 02:57 PM]
September 6, 2019 Notice of deficiency: Certificate of Interested Persons filed by John C. Webber for Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.. Counsel must file an Appearance of Counsel form before any filings are accepted in this appeal. [Entered: 09/06/2019 02:00 PM]
September 5, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John C. Webber for Appellee Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12915] (ECF: John Webber) [Entered: 09/05/2019 10:01 AM]
August 28, 2019 MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mario Mucciolo. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8865477-1] [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:15 PM]
August 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to John C. Webber for Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/24/2019 05:28 PM]
August 15, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Mario Mucciolo. [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:46 AM]
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mario Mucciolo. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:29 AM]
August 5, 2019 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Mario Mucciolo. No hearings. [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:21 PM]
August 1, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Mario Mucciolo was filed on 07/30/2019. Docket Entry 29. [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:37 PM]
July 26, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Mario Mucciolo on 07/25/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/09/2019 as to Appellant Mario Mucciolo. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/23/2019 as to Appellee Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc. [Entered: 08/01/2019 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mario Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital,, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARIO MUCCIOLO
Represented By: Mario Mucciolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOCA RATON REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: John C. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?