Roy Bright v. Mike Howell, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KIMBERLY CADWELL, DONNA WILLIAMS, MIKE HOWELL and RUSSELL PHOPHAM
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROY BRIGHT
Case Number: 19-13179
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Roy Bright failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules; Motion to amend the style of this appeal is MOOT [ # 8879908-2 ] [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:11 PM]
September 19, 2019 RESPONSE to Motion to amend the style of this appeal filed by Appellant Roy Bright [ # 8879908-2 ] filed by Attorney Wesley Calvin Jackson for Appellees Kimberly Cadwell and Mike Howell. [19-13179] (ECF: Wesley Jackson) [Entered: 09/19/2019 05:05 PM]
September 19, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Wesley Calvin Jackson for Appellees Kimberly Cadwell and Mike Howell. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13179] (ECF: Wesley Jackson) [Entered: 09/19/2019 04:49 PM]
September 10, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wesley Calvin Jackson for Kimberly Cadwell and Mike Howell. [19-13179] (ECF: Wesley Jackson) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:10 AM]
September 10, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sun S. Choy for Kimberly Cadwell and Mike Howell. [19-13179] (ECF: Sun Choy) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:08 AM]
September 9, 2019 MOTION to amend the style of this appeal filed by Appellant Roy Bright. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8879908-1] [Entered: 09/13/2019 05:03 PM]
September 9, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Roy Bright. [Entered: 09/13/2019 04:54 PM]
August 20, 2019 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Roy Bright on 08/19/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy Bright v. Mike Howell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY CADWELL
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONNA WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE HOWELL
Represented By: Sun S. Choy
Represented By: Wesley Calvin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSSELL PHOPHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY BRIGHT
Represented By: Roy Bright
Represented By: Riverbend CF Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?