Maestro Faison v. Chief Judge of the Eleventh, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CHIEF JUDGE OF THE ELEVENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, STATE ATTORNEY, Katherine Fernandez, Daniel Voredo, John Meyers and FLORIDA PROBATION AND PAROLE COMMISSION, Marcia Hendry
Plaintiff / Appellant: MAESTRO MATTHEW FAISON
Case Number: 19-13458
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED: BRIEF filed by Maestro Matthew Faison is returned unfiled because this case is closed. No further relief is available from this Court unless the full filing fee is paid to the District Court and a motion to reinstate is filed in this court. [Entered: 10/29/2019 11:25 AM]
October 21, 2019 RETURNED UNFILED: "Motion Direction to The Clerk" filed by Maestro Matthew Faison is returned unfiled because this case is closed. No further relief is available from this Court unless the full filing fee is paid. [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:48 PM]
October 1, 2019 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Maestro Matthew Faison has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 10/01/2019 12:40 PM]
September 27, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Maestro Matthew Faison. [Entered: 09/30/2019 05:27 PM]
September 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Maestro Matthew Faison. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:40 PM]
September 5, 2019 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Maestro Matthew Faison on 09/04/2019. Fee Status: PLRA 3 Strikes. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maestro Faison v. Chief Judge of the Eleventh, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIEF JUDGE OF THE ELEVENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE ATTORNEY, Katherine Fernandez, Daniel Voredo, John Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLORIDA PROBATION AND PAROLE COMMISSION, Marcia Hendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MAESTRO MATTHEW FAISON
Represented By: Maestro Matthew Faison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?