Timothy Brown v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIMOTHY B. BROWN
Case Number: 19-13825
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 15, 2020 Timothy B. Brown v. U.S. Bank National Assoc., et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 09/24/2019 as to Appellant Timothy B. Brown. [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:14 AM]
September 26, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Timothy B. Brown on 09/24/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/05/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/10/2019 as to Appellant Timothy B. Brown. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/24/2019 as to Appellee U.S. Bank National Association [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy Brown v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Represented By: Arthur Allen Ebbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY B. BROWN
Represented By: Timothy B. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?