Gregory Vaughn v. Fedex Freight, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: GREGORY J. VAUGHN
Case Number: 19-14339
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including January 10, 2020 in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 8932520-2 ] WHP [Entered: 11/15/2019 01:53 PM]
November 15, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher L. Lockwood for FedEx Freight, Inc. [19-14339] (ECF: Christopher Lockwood) [Entered: 11/15/2019 11:42 AM]
November 14, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard J.R. Raleigh, Jr. for Appellee Fedex Freight, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14339] (ECF: Richard Raleigh) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:58 PM]
November 14, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard J.R. Raleigh, Jr. for Fedex Freight, Inc.. [19-14339] (ECF: Richard Raleigh) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:55 PM]
November 14, 2019 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 01/10/2020 filed by Gregory J. Vaughn. Motion is Unopposed. [8932520-1] [19-14339] (ECF: Teresa Mastando) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:51 PM]
November 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric J. Artrip for Gregory J. Vaughn. [19-14339] (ECF: Eric Artrip) [Entered: 11/13/2019 04:49 PM]
November 13, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Teresa Ryder Mastando for Appellant Gregory J. Vaughn. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14339] (ECF: Teresa Mastando) [Entered: 11/13/2019 04:34 PM]
November 13, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Teresa Ryder Mastando for Appellant Gregory J. Vaughn. [19-14339] (ECF: Teresa Mastando) [Entered: 11/13/2019 04:11 PM]
November 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Teresa Ryder Mastando for Gregory J. Vaughn. [19-14339] (ECF: Teresa Mastando) [Entered: 11/13/2019 04:01 PM]
October 31, 2019 Appellate fee was paid on 10/30/2019 as to Appellant Gregory J. Vaughn. [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:04 AM]
October 31, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Gregory J. Vaughn on 10/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/10/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/14/2019 as to Appellant Gregory J. Vaughn. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/29/2019 as to Appellee Fedex Freight, Inc. [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Vaughn v. Fedex Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: Richard J.R. Raleigh Jr.
Represented By: Christopher L. Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY J. VAUGHN
Represented By: Teresa Ryder Mastando
Represented By: Eric J. Artrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?