Helen Roseberry v. Apple, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: HELEN ROSEBERRY
Defendant / Appellee: BEST BUY, APPLE, INC. and VERIZON
Case Number: 19-14340
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Helen Roseberry was filed on 12/20/2019. Docket Entry 45. [Entered: 12/20/2019 11:14 AM]
December 12, 2019 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Helen Roseberry. [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:58 AM]
December 12, 2019 MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Appellant Helen Roseberry. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8961775-1] [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:57 AM]
December 4, 2019 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Helen Roseberry failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:17 AM]
November 25, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sara Anne Ford for Appellees AAPL and Best Buy. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14340] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 11/25/2019 05:46 PM]
November 25, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. McKinley Dunn for Apple, Inc. and Best Buy Stores LLP [19-14340] (ECF: William Dunn) [Entered: 11/25/2019 05:31 PM]
November 25, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian P. Kappel for AAPL and Best Buy. [19-14340] (ECF: Brian Kappel) [Entered: 11/25/2019 05:26 PM]
November 25, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sara Anne Ford for AAPL and Best Buy. [19-14340] (ECF: Sara Ford) [Entered: 11/25/2019 05:24 PM]
October 29, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Helen Roseberry on 10/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/12/2019 as to Appellant Helen Roseberry. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/26/2019 as to Appellees Apple, Inc. and Best Buy [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helen Roseberry v. Apple, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HELEN ROSEBERRY
Represented By: Helen Roseberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEST BUY
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Brian P. Kappel
Represented By: William McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: Sara Anne Ford
Represented By: Brian P. Kappel
Represented By: William McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?